EP2847560 - METHOD FOR MEASURING AND CALCULATING A HEAT FLUX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/12] | HEAT TRANSFER MEASUREMENT AND CALCULATION METHOD | ||
[2020/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mischke, Gerald Stettenerstrasse 31 71384 Weinstadt-Endersbach / DE | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | RDL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Senefelderstrasse 26 70176 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | Raible Deissler Lehmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Senefelderstrasse 26 70176 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2015/12] | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13727043.5 | 10.05.2013 | [2020/27] | WO2013EP01385 | Priority number, date | DE20121009080 | 09.05.2012 Original published format: DE102012009080 | [2015/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013167278 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2847560 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2847560 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/10, G01J5/00, G01K17/00, G06F30/13, G06F119/08 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
G01J5/10 (EP,US);
G01K17/06 (US);
G01K13/02 (US);
G01K17/00 (EP,US);
G06F30/13 (EP,US);
G01J2005/0077 (EP,US);
G06F2119/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | G01J5/10, G01J5/00, G01K17/00, G06F17/50 | ||
Former IPC [2015/12] | G01J5/10, G01C11/00, G06F17/50, G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN UND BERECHNEN EINES WÄRMETRANSPORTS | [2015/12] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING AND CALCULATING A HEAT FLUX | [2020/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE ET DE CALCULE D'UN FLUX DE CHALEUR | [2020/03] |
Former [2015/12] | HEAT TRANSFER MEASUREMENT AND CALCULATION METHOD | ||
Former [2015/12] | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE ET DE CALCUL D'UN TRANSPORT DE CHALEUR | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 24.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2013 | AL | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | ES | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | IT | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | PL | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 10.05.2013 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MK | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.05.2013 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MK | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 10.05.2013 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 10.05.2013 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2000206268 (TAISEI CORP) [X] 1,13,15 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,7,8,12; | [I]US6422743 (NIRMALAN NIRM V [US], et al) [I] 1,13,15 * column 2, line 64 - column 6, line 60; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US2003160757 (SHIRAI MASAMI [JP], et al) [Y] 8,12 * paragraphs [0034] - [0046]; figures 1,7 *; | [XY] - REVEL G M ET AL, "Paper;Development and experimental evaluation of a thermography measurement system for real-time monitoring of comfort and heat rate exchange in the built environment;Development and experimental evaluation of a thermography measurement system for real-time monitoring of comfort and heat rate exchan", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20120201), vol. 23, no. 3, doi:10.1088/0957-0233/23/3/035005, ISSN 0957-0233, page 35005, XP020219569 [X] 1-3,6,9-11,13-15 * Section 2.3, 2.4; pages 2-6; figures 1,7 * [Y] 4,5,7,8,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/23/3/035005 | [X] - T ASTARITA ET AL, "A survey on infrared thermography for convective heat transfer measurements", OPTICS & LASER TECHNOLOGY, (20001001), vol. 32, no. 7-8, doi:10.1016/S0030-3992(00)00086-4, ISSN 0030-3992, pages 593 - 610, XP055082176 [X] 1,4 * section 2 and 4.1.1, equations 5 and 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0030-3992(00)00086-4 | [Y] - JONAS ALLEGRINI ET AL, "Analysis of convective heat transfer at building faà PRG ades in street canyons and its influence on the predictions of space cooling demand in buildings", JOURNAL OF WIND ENGINEERING AND INDUSTRIAL AERODYNAMICS, vol. 104, doi:10.1016/J.JWEIA.2012.02.003, ISSN 0167-6105, (20120224), pages 464 - 473, (20120207), XP028429912 [Y] 4 * Abstract, section 2.3; page 467 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jweia.2012.02.003 | [A] - STRAND R K ET AL, "Modeling radiant heating and cooling systems: integration with a whole-building simulation program", ENERGY AND BUILDINGS, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 37, no. 4, ISSN 0378-7788, (20050401), pages 389 - 397, (20050401), XP027756761 [A] 5,7 * section 1. Introduction; page 389 * | [Y] - Wolfgan Feist, "Passiv-VerwaltungsgebäudeWagner & Co. in Cölbe", (200202), URL: http://www.enob.info/fileadmin/media/Publikationen/EnBau/Projektberichte/03_MonitoringAB2_Wagner_p2_k.pdf, (20131014), XP002714823 [Y] 5,7 * page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - JONATHAN D MARKLEY ET AL, "Hybridization of Photogrammetry and Laser Scanning Technology for As-Built 3D CAD Models", 2008 IEEE AEROSPACE CONFERENCE; 1-8 MARCH 2008; BIG SKY; MT, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080301), ISBN 978-1-4244-1487-1, pages 1 - 10, XP031256520 [Y] 8 * Section 4; pages 4-7 * |