|
11.09.2024 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2024 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2024 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2024 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2024 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.09.2024 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2024 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2024 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.2024 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.2024 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.2024 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.2024 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.2024 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2024 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.06.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2024 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
03.03.2024 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 14 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 15 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 16 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 17 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 18 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 19 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 20 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 21 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 22 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 23 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 24 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 25 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 26 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 27 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 28 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 29 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 30 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 31 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 32 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 33 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 34 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 35 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 36 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 37 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 38 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 39 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 40 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 41 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 42 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 43 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 44 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 45 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 46 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 47 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 48 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 49 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 50 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 51 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 52 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 53 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 54 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 55 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 56 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 57 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 58 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 59 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 60 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 61 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 62 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 63 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 64 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 65 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 66 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 67 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 68 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 69 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 70 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 71 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 72 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 73 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 74 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 75 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 76 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 77 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 78 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 79 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 80 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 81 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 82 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 83 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 84 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 85 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 86 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 87 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 88 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 89 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 90 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 91 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 92 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 93 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 94 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 95 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
71 |
|
01.08.2023 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
45 |
|
01.08.2023 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
168 |
|
01.08.2023 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
51 |
|
26.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2023 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
52 |
|
25.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2023 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 001 |
Appeal |
17 |
|
25.07.2023 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 002 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2023 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
25.07.2023 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
01.06.2023 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.06.2023 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2023 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2023 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2023 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2023 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2023 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
34 |
|
16.01.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
34 |
|
16.01.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
34 |
|
12.01.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 11 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 13 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 15 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 17 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 19 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 21 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 23 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 24 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 25 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 26 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 27 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 28 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 29 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 30 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 31 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 33 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 35 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 37 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 39 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 41 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 43 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 45 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 47 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 49 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 51 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 53 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 55 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 57 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 59 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 60 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 61 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 62 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 63 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 64 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 65 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 66 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 67 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 68 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 69 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 71 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 73 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 75 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 77 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 79 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 81 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 83 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 85 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 87 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 88 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 89 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 90 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 91 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 93 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 95 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
27 |
|
22.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
38 |
|
05.12.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
48 |
|
05.12.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
05.12.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
37 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 026 |
Opposition |
221 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 027 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 028 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 029 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
20 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 030 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.09.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
19.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
19.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
10.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 024 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 025 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 025 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
09.08.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
413 |
|
09.08.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
413 |
|
09.08.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
413 |
|
02.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 10 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 11 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 12 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 13 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 14 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 15 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 16 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 17 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 18 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 19 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 20 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 21 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 22 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 23 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 24 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 25 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 26 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 27 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 28 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 29 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 30 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 31 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 32 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 33 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 34 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 35 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 36 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 37 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 38 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 39 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 40 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 41 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 42 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 43 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 44 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 45 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 46 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 47 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 48 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 49 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 50 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 51 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 52 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 53 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 54 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 55 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 56 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 57 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 58 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 59 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 60 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 61 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 62 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 63 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 64 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 65 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 66 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 67 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 68 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 69 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 70 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 71 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 72 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 73 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 74 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 75 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 76 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 77 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 78 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 79 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 80 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 81 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 82 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 83 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 84 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 85 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 86 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 87 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 88 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 89 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 90 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 91 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 92 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 93 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 94 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 95 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
32 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
42 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
45 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
46 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
20 |
|
30.03.2021 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
21 |
|
30.03.2021 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
24 |
|
24.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
64 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 020 |
Opposition |
120 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 021 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 022 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 023 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
23.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
41 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
34 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
36 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
30 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
95 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
69 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
10.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
10.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
15 |
|
16.01.2015 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
24.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
28.07.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
28.07.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |