07.09.2024 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
28.08.2024 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.08.2024 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
28.07.2023 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
25.07.2023 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
26.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of appeal fee following opposition |
|
26.05.2023 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
26.05.2023 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
19.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of appeal fee following opposition |
|
19.05.2023 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
17.05.2023 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
17.05.2023 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
17.03.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
15.03.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
24.12.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
26.11.2021 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
04.08.2021 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
08.04.2021 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
26.03.2021 |
Opposition filed |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
22.05.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
18.05.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.05.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.05.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.04.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.03.2020 |
Change - inventor |
|
27.03.2020 |
Change - French title |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
18.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.11.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.06.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.08.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
31.08.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
27.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.02.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.01.2018 |
First examination report |
|
28.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
28.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
26.06.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
12.06.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
30.01.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
20.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
26.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|