Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013160871 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013160566 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10865483 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2020 | B2 | US2019169754 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816207888 | 03.12.2018 | US201314397108 | 25.04.2013 | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10294558 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2019 | B2 | US2015125714 | 07.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101656166B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2016 | B1 | KR20150012256 | 03.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6487474B | Global Dossier | 20.03.2019 | B2 | JP2017128810 | 27.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6143845B | Global Dossier | 07.06.2017 | B2 | JP2015521233 | 27.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107012419B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2019 | B | CN107012419 | 04.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201380028915 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104334764B | Global Dossier | 14.07.2017 | B | CN104334764 | 04.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2871672 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2017 | C | CA2871672 | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2841615 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2020 | B1 | EP2841615 | 04.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014026681 | 20.10.2020 | B1 | BR112014026681 | 27.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2808663T | 01.03.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE051979T | 28.04.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN9954DELNP2014 | 14.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA37452 | 29.04.2016 | B1 | MA20150099 | 31.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2014013007 | 07.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2841615T | 16.11.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13727384 | 25.04.2013 | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2583193 | 10.05.2016 | C1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA114627 | 10.07.2017 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB53286 | 25.04.2013 | WO2012FR50906 | 25.04.2012 |