EP2864566 - ANTI-INTRUSION SLIDING DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilgen Door Systems AG Freiburgstrasse 34 3150 Schwarzenburg / CH | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÜTSCH, Beat Funkstrasse 89 3084 Wabern / CH | 02 /
KABA, Liridon Könizstrasse 154 CH-3097 Liebefeld / CH | [2018/49] |
Former [2015/18] | 01 /
DÜTSCH, Beat Flugplatzstrasse 15 CH-3122 Kehrsatz / CH | ||
02 /
KABA, Liridon Könizstrasse 154 CH-3097 Liebefeld / CH | Representative(s) | Bremi, Tobias Hans Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2018/48] |
Former [2015/18] | Bremi, Tobias Hans Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 13727601.0 | 06.06.2013 | [2018/48] | WO2013EP61671 | Priority number, date | CH20120087612 | 21.06.2012 Original published format: CH 876122012 | [2015/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013189749 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864566 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2864566 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/48] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2864566 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | [2019/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2864566 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/08, E06B3/46 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
E06B5/113 (EP,US);
E05B65/08 (US);
E05B65/0811 (EP,US);
E05C19/00 (US);
E05D15/0621 (US);
E06B3/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | EINBRUCHHEMMENDE SCHIEBETÜR | [2015/18] | English: | ANTI-INTRUSION SLIDING DOOR | [2015/18] | French: | PORTE COULISSANTE ANTI-EFFRACTION | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 30.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2017 | Observations by third parties | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2019
26.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE Landert Group AG Unterweg 14 8180 Bülach / CH Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | 02
23.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2019
26.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE Landert Group AG Unterweg 14 8180 Bülach / CH Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | ||
02
23.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | |||
Former [2019/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE Landert Group AG Unterweg 14 8180 Bülach / CH Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | 16.09.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.12.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.12.2020 | 08.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2021 | 15.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.07.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.10.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 24.05.2022 | Appeal received No. T1382/22 | 24.05.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.07.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2013 | AL | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | ES | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MK | 28.11.2018 | MT | 28.11.2018 | PL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | RS | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | SM | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | IE | 06.06.2019 | LU | 06.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.06.2013 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
MT | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 06.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.06.2013 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 06.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 06.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 06.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 28.11.2018 | |
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 28.11.2018 | |
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 28.11.2018 | |
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3774342 (THOM K) [X] 1,2,20 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [AD]EP1431501 (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1936098 (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document * | Examination | US3650071 | US4475313 | EP0572936 | US5452925 | US7059017 | US2010192466 | US2012146346 | other | US3650071 | US3774342 | US4475313 | US5355805 | US5452925 | US7059017 | US2012146346 | Opposition | US3774342 | DE10259924 | US2008148790 | AU2008230042B | US3650071 | US4475313 | EP0572936 | US5355805 | US5452925 | EP1431501 | US7059017 | DE19634391 | EP1936098 | US2010192466 | US8006436 | US2012146346 | EP2481871 |