EP2849707 - ABSORBENT ARTICLES WITH ELASTICS IN MULTIPLE LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADE, Sarah, Marie One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
GLAHN, Tina, Marie One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 03 /
LAVON, Gary, Dean OneP&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 04 /
JURATOVAC, Diana, Woehnl Design Central Inc. 6464 Presidential Gateway Columbus, Ohio 43231 / US | 05 /
ISHIHARA, Kaoru One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 06 /
NISHIKAWA, Masaharu One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 07 /
ZINK, Ronald, Joseph One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 08 /
MACURA, Anna, Elizabeth One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Borbach, Markus Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 13727693.7 | 14.05.2013 | WO2013US40896 | Priority number, date | US201261646999P | 15.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261646999 P | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013173298 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2849707 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/496 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
A61F13/49011 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/49 (RU);
A61F13/49012 (US);
A61F13/49019 (US);
A61F13/4906 (US);
A61F13/49061 (US);
A61F13/5622 (US);
A61F13/64 (US);
A61F2013/49088 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGE ARTIKEL MIT GUMMIEINSÄTZEN IN MEHREREN SCHICHTEN | [2015/13] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLES WITH ELASTICS IN MULTIPLE LAYERS | [2015/13] | French: | ARTICLES ABSORBANTS COMPRENANT DES ÉLASTIQUES EN COUCHES MULTIPLES | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 23.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/25] | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH07299094 (ZUIKO KK); | [X]US2009177176 (SAITO TETSUHIRO [JP]) | by applicant | US3848594 | US4662875 | US4699622 | US4846815 | US4894060 | US4946527 | US5151092 | US5221274 | US6428526 | US6432098 | US2003060794 | US2005222546 |