EP2861067 - SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PROTECTION OF AGRARIAN CROPS AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stichting I-F Product Collaboration Prins Bernhardplein 200 1097 JB Amsterdam / NL | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLACINI, Franco Via Giacomo Balla 14 I-20151 Milano / IT | 02 /
VAZZOLA, Matteo Santino Via P. Mascagni 11 I-20815 Cogliate (MB) / IT | 03 /
GUSMEROLI, Marilena Viale Libertà 114/B I-20900 Monza (MB) / IT | 04 /
SINANI, Entela Via Monte San Michele 4 I-28100 Novara / IT | 05 /
RISERVATO, Manuela Via Maestra T.Q. 130 I-28100 Novara / IT | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Bottero, Carlo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2015/17] | Application number, filing date | 13728226.5 | 13.06.2013 | [2020/49] | WO2013EP62306 | Priority number, date | IT2012MI01045 | 15.06.2012 Original published format: IT MI20121045 | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013186325 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2861067 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2861067 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/20, A01N35/04, A01N37/34, A01N37/36, A01N43/56, A01N37/50, A01P3/00 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
A01N43/56 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01N37/10 (IL,KR,US);
A01N37/34 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01N37/50 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01N43/54 (IL,KR,US);
A01N43/653 (IL,KR,US);
A01N43/84 (IL,KR,US);
A01N47/38 (IL,US);
A01N47/40 (EP,IL,US);
A01N59/20 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/34, A01N43/40, A01N43/54, A01N47/24, A01N2300/00 (US);
A01N37/50, A01N37/34, A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/56, A01N37/34, A01N37/46, A01N37/50, A01N43/36, A01N43/40, A01N43/50, A01N43/54, A01N47/12, A01N47/18, A01N47/24, A01N47/34, A01N51/00, A01N59/20, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N59/20, A01N59/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2015/17] | A01N35/04, A01N37/34, A01N37/36, A01N37/38, A01N37/46, A01N37/50, A01N43/30, A01N43/36, A01N43/40, A01N43/50, A01N43/54, A01N43/56, A01N43/653, A01N43/84, A01N43/88, A01N47/02, A01N47/12, A01N47/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM SCHUTZ VON LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN PFLANZEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2015/17] | English: | SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PROTECTION OF AGRARIAN CROPS AND THE USE THEREOF | [2015/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS SYNERGÉTIQUES POUR LA PROTECTION DE RÉCOLTES AGRICOLES ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 13.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20202247.1 / EP3788875 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.12.2020 | CY | 02.12.2020 | HR | 02.12.2020 | MC | 02.12.2020 | MK | 02.12.2020 | MT | 02.12.2020 | RS | 02.12.2020 | SM | 02.12.2020 | IS | 02.04.2021 | LU | 13.06.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
MK | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | HR | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 02.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2011135833 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0009] , [0011] , [0016] , [0103] - [0127] * * tables 1,3,5,7,9,11,13,15,17,19,21 *[I] 5,9 | by applicant | US5093347 | EP0654464 | WO0046184 | WO2007031508 | WO2009156098 | WO2011135833 | WO2011135835 | WO2011135836 | WO2011135837 | WO2011135838 | WO2011135839 | WO2011135827 | WO2011135828 | WO2011135830 | WO2011135831 | WO2011135832 | WO2011135834 | WO2011135840 | - WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22 |