EP2994070 - POROUS DENTAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joint Stock Company Altimed ul. Proectiruemaya 2A, k.1 213760 Osipovichi / BY | [2020/29] |
Former [2016/11] | For all designated states Altimed International S.A. Rue du Cendrier 17 1201 Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOSTA, Anatoli, D. per. Voiskovoi 13-12 Minsk 220034 / BY | 02 /
HALAUKO, Aliaksandr, I. ul. Jukovskogo 25-52 Minsk 220007 / BY | 03 /
DOSTA, Dmitri, A. ul. Krasnaya 22-20 Minsk 220005 / BY | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2016/11] | Application number, filing date | 13729069.8 | 07.05.2013 | [2016/11] | WO2013IB00971 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014181144 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2994070 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2994070 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
A61C8/0037 (EP,US);
A61C8/0019 (EP,US);
A61B6/51 (US);
A61C8/0012 (EP,US);
A61C8/0022 (US);
A61C8/0036 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORÖSES ZAHNIMPLANTAT | [2016/11] | English: | POROUS DENTAL IMPLANT | [2016/11] | French: | IMPLANT DENTAIRE POREUX | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2013 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | NL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MK | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US2005112397 (ROLFE JONATHAN L [US], et al); | [X]WO2010139041 (JOINT STOCK COMPANY ALTIMED [BY], et al) | by applicant | EP0296335 | WO9721393 | WO9724084 | DE19816865 | US6244868 | BY10325 | US2005112397 | WO2008052300 |