EP2846819 - VARIANTS OF TACE PRO-DOMAIN AS TNF-A INHIBITOR AND THEIR MEDICAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. At the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2017/18] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. At the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAGI, Irit 2 Meonot WIX 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
WONG, Eitan c/o Yeda Research And Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
AFIK, Ran c/o Yeda Research And Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2015/12] | Vogel, Andreas, et al Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 13729107.6 | 09.05.2013 | [2017/18] | WO2013IL50400 | Priority number, date | US201261644551P | 09.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261644551 P | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013168164 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2846819 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2846819 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, C07K14/00 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
A61K38/4886 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N9/6489 (EP,US);
C12Y304/24086 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VARIANTEN DER TACE PRO-DOMÄNE ALS TNF-A-HEMMER UND DEREN MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2015/12] | English: | VARIANTS OF TACE PRO-DOMAIN AS TNF-A INHIBITOR AND THEIR MEDICAL USE | [2015/12] | French: | VARIANTS DE PRO-DOMAINE TACE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEUR DE TNF-A ET LEUR UTILISATION MÉDICALE | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2013 | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | IE | 09.05.2017 | LU | 09.05.2017 | MT | 09.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005030798 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * example 2 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 5 * * page 1c; figure 1c * | [XA] - GONZALES PATRICIA E ET AL, "Inhibition of the tumor necrosis factor-alpha-converting enzyme by its pro domain", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20040723), vol. 279, no. 30, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 31638 - 31645, XP002713545 [X] 31,38-41 * the whole document * [A] 1-30,32-37,42 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M401311200 | [A] - LI XIAOOU ET AL, "The study of the inhibition of the recombinant TACE prodomain to endotoxemia in mice", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES, MOLECULAR DIVERSITY PRESERVATION INTERNATIONAL, BASEL, CH, (20091218), vol. 10, no. 12, doi:10.3390/IJMS10125442, ISSN 1422-0067, pages 5442 - 5454, XP009172684 [A] 1-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms10125442 | [A] - WONG EITAN ET AL, "THE TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR-A CONVERTING ENZYME (TACE) IS REGULATED BY PHYSIOLOGICAL IONIC STRENGTH", ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, SPRINGER, US, (20110101), vol. 691, ISSN 0065-2598, page 796, XP009172659 [A] 1-42 * abstract * | by applicant | US7655752 | US4554101 | US5428130 | US2007148167 | US2006228349 | US5464764 | US5487992 | US4666828 | US4683202 | US4801531 | US5192659 | US5272057 | US3791932 | US3839153 | US3850752 | US3850578 | US3853987 | US3867517 | US3879262 | US3901654 | US3935074 | US3984533 | US3996345 | US4034074 | US4098876 | US4879219 | US5011771 | US5281521 | - DASGUPTA, S. ET AL., BIOORG MED CHEM, (2009), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 444 - 59 | - MOSS, M.L. ET AL., NAT CLIN PRACT RHEUMATOL, (2008), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 300 - 9 | - WISNIEWSKA ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (2008), vol. 381, no. 5, pages 1307 - 19 | - GEORGIADIS, D.; A. YIOTAKIS, BIOORG MED CHEM, (2008), vol. 16, no. 19, pages 8781 - 94 | - LEONARD, J.D. ET AL., BIOCHEM J, (2005), vol. 387, pages 797 - 805 | - GONZALES, P.E. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2004), vol. 279, no. 30, pages 31638 - 45 | - MASKOS, K. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, no. 7, pages 3408 - 12 | - LI ET AL., INT J MOL SCI., (200912), vol. 10, no. 12, pages 5442 - 5454 | - BUCKLEY, AM J PHYSIOL LUNG CELL MOL PHYSIOL, (2005), vol. 288, pages L1132 - L1138 | - MOLLOY, S. S., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, page 16396 | - NAKAYAMA, K., BIOCHEM J., (1997), vol. 327, page 625 | - BITTER ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 153, pages 516 - 544 | - STUDIER ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 185, pages 60 - 89 | - BRISSON ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 310, pages 511 - 514 | - TAKAMATSU ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 307 - 311 | - CORUZZI ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 1671 - 1680 | - BROGLI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 224, pages 838 - 843 | - GURLEY ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL, (1986), vol. 6, pages 559 - 565 | - WEISSBACH; WEISSBACH, Methods for Plant Molecular Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1988), pages 421 - 463 | - GILBOA, BIOTECHNIQUES, vol. 4, no. 6, pages 504 - 512 | - BOOTH ET AL., IMMUNOL. LETT., (1988), vol. 19, pages 65 - 70 | - GARDELLA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 15854 - 15859 | - SASSENFELD, TIBTECH, (1990), vol. 8, pages 88 - 9 | - CLARK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 21969 - 21977 | - LU ET AL., INT. J. PEPT. PROTEIN RES., (1994), vol. 43, pages 127 - 38 | - LU ET AL., PEPT. RES., (1993), vol. 6, pages 140 - 6 | - FELIX ET AL., INT. J. PEPT. PROTEIN RES., (1995), vol. 46, pages 253 - 64 | - GAERTNER ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (1996), vol. 7, pages 38 - 44 | - TSUTSUMI ET AL., THROMB. HAEMOST., (1997), vol. 77, pages 168 - 73 | - FRANCIS ET AL., INT. J. HEMATOL., (1998), vol. 68, pages 1 - 18 | - ROBERTS ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1998), vol. 87, pages 1440 - 45 | - TAN ET AL., PROTEIN EXPR. PURIF., (1998), vol. 12, pages 45 - 52 | - CALICETI; VERONESE, ADV. DRUG DELIV. REV., (2003), vol. 55, pages 1261 - 77 | - "Gene Therapy", Advanced in Pharmacology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1997), vol. 40 | - CHEN ET AL., CANCER GENE THERAPY, (2004), vol. 11, no. 11, pages 740 - 747 | - KRENN V. ET AL., HISTOL HISTOPATHOL, (200007), vol. 15, no. 3, page 791 | - JAN VOSWINKEL ET AL., ARTHRITIS RES, (2001), vol. 3, no. 3, page 189 | - ERIKSON J. ET AL., IMMUNOL RES, (1998), vol. 17, no. 1-2, page 49 | - RENAUDINEAU Y. ET AL., CLIN DIAGN LAB IMMUNOL., (199903), vol. 6, no. 2, page 156 | - CHAN OT. ET AL., IMMUNOL REV, (199906), vol. 169, page 107 | - ZIMMET P., DIABETES RES CLIN PRACT, (199610), vol. 34, page S125 | - ORGIAZZI J., ENDOCRINOL METAB CLIN NORTH AM, (200006), vol. 29, no. 2, page 339 | - BRALEY-MULLEN H.; YU S, J IMMUNOL, (20001215), vol. 165, no. 12, page 7262 | - TOYODA N. ET AL., NIPPON RINSHO, (199908), vol. 57, no. 8, page 1810 | - MITSUMA T., NIPPON RINSHO., (199908), vol. 57, no. 8, page 1759 | - GARZA KM ET AL., J REPROD IMMUNOL, (199802), vol. 37, no. 2, page 87 | - DIEKMAN AB. ET AL., AM J REPROD IMMUNOL., (200003), vol. 43, no. 3, page 134 | - TINCANI A. ET AL., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 107 - 9 | - CROSS AH. ET AL., J NEUROIMMUNOL, (20010101), vol. 112, no. 1-2, page 1 | - ORON L. ET AL., J NEURAL TRANSM, (1997), vol. 49, page 77 | - INFANTE AJ.; KRAIG E, INT REV IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 18, no. 1-2, page 83 | - KORNBERG AJ., J CLIN NEUROSCI, (200005), vol. 7, no. 3, page 19.1 | - KUSUNOKI S., AM J MED SCI., (200004), vol. 319, no. 4, page 234 | - TAKAMORI M, AM J MED SCI., (200004), vol. 319, no. 4, page 204 | - ANTOINE JC.; HONNORAT J., REV NEUROL (PARIS, (200001), vol. 156, no. 1, page 23 | - NOBILE-ORAZIO E ET AL., ELECTROENCEPHALOGR CLIN NEUROPHYSIOL, (1999), vol. 50, page 419 | - VINCENT A. ET AL., ANN N Y ACAD SCI., (19980513), vol. 841, page 482 | - MATSUURA E. ET AL., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, page S135 | - VAARALA O., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, page 5132 | - PRAPROTNIK S. ET AL., WIEN KLIN WOCHENSCHR, (20000825), vol. 112, no. 15-16, page 660 | - LACROIX-DESMAZES S. ET AL., SEMIN THROMB HEMOST., (2000), vol. 26, no. 2, page 157 | - NOEL LH., ANN MED INTERNE (PARIS)., (200005), vol. 151, no. 3, page 178 | - FLAMHOLZ R. ET AL., J CLIN APHERESIS, (1999), vol. 14, no. 4, page 171 | - WALLUKAT G. ET AL., AM J CARDIOL., (19990617), vol. 83, no. 12A, page 75H | - MOCCIA F., ANN ITAL MED INT., (199904), vol. 14, no. 2, page 114 | - EFREMOV DG. ET AL., LEUK LYMPHOMA, (199801), vol. 28, no. 3-4, page 285 | - GARCIA HEROLA A. ET AL., GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL., (200001), vol. 23, no. 1, page 16 | - LANDAU YE.; SHOENFELD Y., HAREFUAH, (20000116), vol. 138, no. 2, page 122 | - FEIST E. ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (200009), vol. 123, no. 1, page 92 | - ZAULI D. ET AL., BIOMED PHARMACOTHER, (199906), vol. 53, no. 5-6, page 234 | - MANNS MP., J HEPATOL, (200008), vol. 33, no. 2, page 326 | - STRASSBURG CP. ET AL., EUR J GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL., (199906), vol. 1, no. 6, page 595 | - TISCH R; MCDEVITT HO., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (19940118), vol. 91, no. 2, page 437 | - DATTA SK., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 9, page 591 | - CASTANO L.; EISENBARTH GS, ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., vol. 8, page 647 | - SAKATA S. ET AL., MOL CELL ENDOCRINOL, (199303), vol. 92, no. 1, page 77 | - GARZA KM. ET AL., J REPROD IMMUNOL, (199802), vol. 37, no. 2, page 87 | - ALEXANDER RB. ET AL., UROLOGY, (199712), vol. 50, no. 6, page 893 | - HARA T. ET AL., BLOOD, (19910301), vol. 77, no. 5, page 1127 | - SODERSTROM M. ET AL., J NEUROL NEUROSURG PSYCHIATRY, (199405), vol. 57, no. 5, page 544 | - OSHIMA M. ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (199012), vol. 20, no. 12, page 2563 | - HIEMSTRA HS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (20010327), vol. 98, no. 7, page 3988 | - CUNHA-NETO E. ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (19961015), vol. 98, no. 8, page 1709 | - SEMPLE JW. ET AL., BLOOD, (19960515), vol. 87, no. 10, page 4245 | - CAPOROSSI AP ET AL., VIRAL IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 11, no. 1, page 9 | - SALLAH S. ET AL., ANN HEMATOL, (199703), vol. 74, no. 3, page 139 | - FRANCO A. ET AL., CLIN IMMUNOL IMMUNOPATHOL, (199003), vol. 54, no. 3, page 382 | - JONES DE., CLIN SCI (COLCH, (199611), vol. 91, no. 5, page 551 | - KELLY CJ., J AM SOC NEPHROL, (199008), vol. 1, no. 2, page 140 | - YOO TJ. ET AL., CELL IMMUNOL, (199408), vol. 157, no. 1, page 249 | - GLODDEK B. ET AL., ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (19971229), vol. 830, page 266 | - VAARALA O., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, page S132 | - NOEL LH, ANN MED INTERNE (PARIS, (200005), vol. 151, no. 3, page 178 | - SALLAH S ET AL., ANN HEMATOL, (199703), vol. 74, no. 3, page 139 | - CAPOROSSI AP ET AL., VIRAL IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. !, no. 1, page 9 | - TISCH R; MCDEVITT HO., PROC NATL ACAD SCI UNITS S A, (19940118), vol. 91, no. 2, page 437 | - CASTANO L.; EISENBARTH GS., ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., vol. 8, page 647 | - UROLOGY, (199712), vol. 50, no. 6, page 893 | - JONES DE, CLIN SCI (COLCH, (199611), vol. 91, no. 5, page 551 | - STRASSBURG CP. ET AL., EUR J GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL., (199906), vol. L, no. 6, page 595 | - KORNBERG AJ., J CLIN NEUROSCI., (200005), vol. 7, no. 3, page 191 | - TAKAMORI M., AM J MED SCI., (200004), vol. 319, no. 4, page 204 | - HIEMSTRA HS. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI UNITS S A, (20010327), vol. 98, no. 7, page 3988 | - NOBILE-ORAZIO E. ET AL., ELECTROENCEPHALOGR CLIN NEUROPHYSIOL, (1999), vol. 50, page 419 | - RENAUDINEAU Y. ET AL., CLIN DIAGN LAB IMMUNOL, (199903), vol. 6, no. 2, page 156 | - FINGL ET AL., The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (1975), page L | - AUSUBEL, R. M.,, Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, (1994), vol. I-III | - WATSON ET AL., Recombinant DNA, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN BOOKS | - BIRREN ET AL., Genome Analysis: A Laboratory Manual Series, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1998), vol. 1-4 | - CELLIS, J. E.,, Cell Biology: A Laboratory Handbook, (1994), vol. I-III | - FRESHNEY; 1994, Culture of Animal Cells - A Manual of Basic Technique, WILEY | - COLIGAN J. E.,, Current Protocols in Immunology, (1994), vol. I-III | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 1-317 | - GONZALES, J BIOL CHEM, (2004), vol. 279, no. 30 | - GONZALES, P.E. ET AL., "Inhibition of the tumor necrosis factor-alpha-converting enzyme by its pro domain", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 279, no. 30, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M401311200, pages 31638 - 31645, XP002713545 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M401311200 | - WIRTZ, S. ET AL., "Chemically induced mouse models of intestinal inflammation", NAT PROTOC, (2007), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1038/nprot.2007.41, pages 541 - 6, XP009171305 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2007.41 | - REUTER, B.K. ET AL., "Exacerbation of inflammation-associated colonic injury in rat through inhibition of cyclooxygenase-2", J CLIN INVEST, (1996), vol. 98, no. 9, pages 2076 - 85 | - ELSON, C.O. ET AL., "Hapten-induced model of murine inflammatory bowel disease: mucosa immune responses and protection by tolerance", J IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 157, no. 5, pages 2174 - 85 |