EP2841272 - INTAGLIO PRINTING PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KBA-NotaSys SA PO Box 347 55, Avenue du Grey 1000 Lausanne 22 / CH | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERSTEN, Thomas Route Aloys-Fauquez 141 1018 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
SCHAEDE, Johannes, Georg Max-Heim-Strasse 8 97074 Würzburg / DE | 03 /
WÜRSCH, Alain Chemin des Bulesses 70 1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | 04 /
SCHWITZKY, Volkmar, Rolf Flürleinstrasse 28 97076 Würzburg / DE | 05 /
SCHARKUS, Volker c/o Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2016/30] |
Former [2015/10] | 01 /
KERSTEN, Thomas Route Aloys-Fauquez 141 CH-1018 Lausanne / CH | ||
02 /
SCHAEDE, Johannes, Georg Max-Heim-Strasse 8 97074 Wurzburg / DE | |||
03 /
WÜRSCH, Alain Chemin des Bulesses 70 CH-1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | |||
04 /
SCHWITZKY, Volkmar, Rolf Flürleinstrasse 28 97076 Würzburg / DE | |||
05 /
SCHARKUS, Volker c/o Koenig&Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str- 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | Representative(s) | Noll, Ronald c/o STICS Group Sàrl Chemin Curé-Desclouds 2 PO Box 185 1226 Thônex / CH | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 13729438.5 | 24.04.2013 | [2016/30] | WO2013IB53247 | Priority number, date | EP20120165388 | 24.04.2012 Original published format: EP 12165388 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013160853 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2841272 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2841272 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/00, B41F13/008, B41F9/00, B41F9/01, B41F9/06 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
B41F13/0008 (EP,US);
B41F9/061 (US);
B41F13/008 (EP,US);
B41F9/00 (EP,US);
B41F9/003 (US);
B41F9/01 (EP,US);
B41F9/08 (EP,US);
B41F9/10 (US);
B41F13/00 (RU);
B41P2213/208 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TIEFDRUCKPRESSE | [2015/10] | English: | INTAGLIO PRINTING PRESS | [2015/10] | French: | PRESSE A IMPRIMER EN CREUX | [2016/10] |
Former [2015/10] | PRESSE À IMPRIMER EN CREUX | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2013 | AL | 27.07.2016 | BE | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | IE | 24.04.2017 | LU | 24.04.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/47] | HU | 24.04.2013 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.04.2013 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0653302 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [Y] 1-14 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 3; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US5950502 (GENOVESE VINCENT [US]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0984201 (HARMONIC DRIVE SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 1-14* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1717025 (KBA GIORI SA [CH]) [Y] 1-14 * column 28 - column 29; figure 2b *; | [Y]EP2338682 (KBA NOTASYS SA [CH]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059]; figures 2a, 7 * | by applicant | WO9736813 | WO9737329 | WO03047862 | WO03070465 | WO2004069538 | WO2005077656 | WO2007116353 | WO2011077348 | WO2011077350 | WO2011077351 | WO2011161656 |