EP2865062 - ELECTRICAL CIRCUIT FOR CUTTING OFF AN ELECTRICAL SUPPLY WITH RELAY AND FUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2018/37] |
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20, quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALETTE, Patrick c/o SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02 /
GUILLOT, François c/o SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2015/18] | Application number, filing date | 13730268.3 | 21.06.2013 | [2018/37] | WO2013EP63040 | Priority number, date | FR20120055872 | 21.06.2012 Original published format: FR 1255872 | [2015/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013190109 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2865062 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2865062 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/02, B64D47/00 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
H02J1/08 (EP,US);
H02H3/02 (US);
B64D43/00 (US);
B64D2221/00 (EP,US);
H02J2310/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE SCHALTUNG ZUM ABSCHALTEN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN STROMQUELLE MIT RELAIS UND SCHMELZSICHERUNGEN | [2015/18] | English: | ELECTRICAL CIRCUIT FOR CUTTING OFF AN ELECTRICAL SUPPLY WITH RELAY AND FUSES | [2015/18] | French: | CIRCUIT ELECTRIQUE DE COUPURE D'UNE ALIMENTATION ELECTRIQUE A RELAIS ET FUSIBLES | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 10.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2013 | AL | 12.09.2018 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | ES | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | HR | 12.09.2018 | IT | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | MK | 12.09.2018 | MT | 12.09.2018 | NL | 12.09.2018 | PL | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | RS | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | SM | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | NO | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 12.09.2018 | ||
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
MT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 12.09.2018 | ||
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2771564 (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 1 ** page 7, line 5 - line 19 *; | [A]US2005110526 (ISHIBASHI ATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 50 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008113337 (LTB LASERTECHNIK BERLIN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,6 * * page 8, line 11 - page 10, line 13 * |