EP2877342 - NOVEL SHAPING PROCESS FOR PMI FOAM MATERIALS AND/OR COMPOSITE COMPONENTS PRODUCED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2015/33] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Evonik Industries AG Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINTO, Jorge Heidelberger Str. 79 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
ROTH, Matthias Alexander 3006 West Blue Ridge Drive Mobile, Alabama 36693 / US | 03 /
SÜNDERMANN, Jörn Daniel Fiedlerweg 28 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
KRAATZ, Arnim Graupnerweg 49 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
SCHLAGER, Dieter Dorfstr. 4 91481 Altershausen / DE | 06 /
ZIMMERMANN, Rainer - deceased / DE | [2015/23] | Application number, filing date | 13730588.4 | 24.06.2013 | [2016/51] | WO2013EP63137 | Priority number, date | US201261675011P | 24.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261675011 P | [2015/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014016068 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2877342 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2877342 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29K627/06, B29K23/00, B29K33/00, B32B27/06, B29K75/00, B29K79/00, B29C43/52, B29K105/04, B32B5/18, B29C44/56, C08J9/36, B29C35/08, B29C51/06, B29C51/14, B29C51/42, B29K105/24, B29K105/12 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
B29C44/5627 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B5/18 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B29C43/52 (RU,US);
B29C44/56 (KR);
B29C44/5636 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C44/5681 (EP,CN,US);
B29C51/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C51/105 (KR);
B29C51/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C51/421 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B27/065 (EP,CN,US);
C08J9/365 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,CN,US);
B29C35/08 (RU);
B29K2023/12 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2033/26 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2079/08 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2105/12 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2105/24 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2623/06 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2623/12 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2627/06 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2875/00 (RU);
B29K2995/0025 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2266/0242 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2266/025 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2266/0278 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2305/022 (KR);
B32B2305/72 (KR);
B32B27/06 (RU);
C08J2323/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08J2333/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/23] | B32B5/18, B29C35/08, B29C44/56, B29C51/10, C08J9/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUER FORMGEBUNGSPROZESS FÜR PMI-SCHAUMWERKSTOFFE BZW. DARAUS HERGESTELLTE COMPOSITEBAUTEILE | [2015/23] | English: | NOVEL SHAPING PROCESS FOR PMI FOAM MATERIALS AND/OR COMPOSITE COMPONENTS PRODUCED THEREFROM | [2015/23] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ DE FORMAGE DE MATÉRIAUX EXPANSÉS À BASE DE PMI OU PIÈCES COMPOSITES FABRIQUÉES À PARTIR DE CES MATÉRIAUX | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 22.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2013 | AL | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | MT | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | RS | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | IE | 24.06.2017 | LU | 24.06.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 24.06.2013 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.06.2017 | ||
LU | 24.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 24.06.2013 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.06.2017 | ||
LU | 24.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.06.2013 | |
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.06.2017 | ||
LU | 24.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.06.2017 | ||
LU | 24.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0488762 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-10* figure 3; examples 6-9; claims 26, 29, 30 *; | [I]US5976288 (EKENDAHL LARS O [SE]) [I] 1 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 6; figures 2B, 3; claims 1, 3, 6, 7 * * column 6, lines 6-12 * * column 7, lines 59-61 *; | [XI]US2009284048 (DONG KEVIN LIPING [CA], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0071] , [0 79]; examples 1-3; claims 1, 4, 16, 20, 22 24-27 * [I] 2-10 | by applicant | EP0272359 | US4933131 | WO02098637 | EP1444293 | EP1678244 | WO2011138060 | - PASSARO ET AL., POLYMER COMPOSITES, (2004), vol. 25, no. 3, page 307FF | - GREFENSTEIN ET AL., "International SAMPE Symposium and Exhibition", ADV.MATERIALS: CHALLENGE NEXT DECADE, (1990), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 234 - 44 | - W. PIP, KUNSTSTOFFE, (1988), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 201 - 5 | - U. BREUER, POLYMER COMPOSITES, (1998), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 275 - 9 |