EP2845379 - TRANSMITTING INITIATION DETAILS FROM A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/20] |
Former [2015/11] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUEHNEL, Thomas c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
HASSAN, Amer c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 13730966.2 | 24.05.2013 | WO2013US42551 | Priority number, date | US201213489483 | 06.06.2012 Original published format: US201213489483 | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013184394 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2845379 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04M1/2745, G06F3/0487 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/2757 (EP,US);
H04L12/1818 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1636 (EP,KR,US);
H04M2250/12 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON STARTDETAILS VON EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG | [2015/11] | English: | TRANSMITTING INITIATION DETAILS FROM A MOBILE DEVICE | [2015/11] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE DÉTAILS DE DÉCLENCHEMENT À PARTIR D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 23.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP1717963 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE]) [I] 1,3-6,10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0007] - [0009] - [0029] - [0034] - [0037] , [0038] * * figures 1,2 *; | [I]US2011319016 (GORMLEY GEORGIANA [US], et al) [I] 1,3-6,10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0011] - [0013] - [0015] - [0017] - [0026] , [0034] ** figures 1-6 * |