|
25.10.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
27.01.2015 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.01.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2014 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.08.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.08.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2014 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
12 |