EP2863797 - SUB-EPIDERMAL ELECTRIC WARNING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PharmaSens AG Neumattenweg 8 4105 Biel-Benken / CH | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADVÁRY, Paul Neumattenweg 8 CH-4105 Biel-Benken / CH | 02 /
TSCHIRKY, Hansjörg Haldenweg 7A CH-4450 Sissach / CH | 03 /
DINGER, Rudolf Charrières 7 CH-2024 Saint-Aubin / CH | 04 /
MICHOT, Jean-Pierre Brunnmattstrasse 5 CH-4053 Basel / CH | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat AG Peter Merian-Strasse 28 4052 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Holeestrasse 87 4054 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2015/18] | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 4054 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13731311.0 | 12.06.2013 | [2022/04] | WO2013EP62180 | Priority number, date | EP20120173390 | 25.06.2012 Original published format: EP 12173390 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014001091 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2863797 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2863797 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61M5/142, A61M5/50, A61N1/38, A61B5/00 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/6833 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61N1/36017 (KR,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/4839 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/6848 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/688 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/7455 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M5/14244 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M5/14248 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M5/16831 (KR,US);
A61M5/1723 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61N1/0502 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61N1/32 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2562/242 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M2005/14252 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBEPIDERMALE ELEKTRISCHE WARNVORRICHTUNG | [2015/18] | English: | SUB-EPIDERMAL ELECTRIC WARNING DEVICE | [2015/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF AVERTISSEUR ÉLECTRIQUE SOUS-ÉPIDERMIQUE | [2021/36] |
Former [2015/18] | DISPOSITIF D'AVERTISSEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE SOUS-ÉPIDERMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 13.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2020 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2013 | AL | 26.01.2022 | CY | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | FI | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | MK | 26.01.2022 | MT | 26.01.2022 | PL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | IE | 12.06.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 12.06.2013 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
MK | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 12.06.2013 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 12.06.2013 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 26.01.2022 | |
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 26.01.2022 | |
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | FI | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NO | 26.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | US4456012 [ ] (LATTIN GARY A [US]) [ ] * column 1, lines 47-61 * * column 6, lines 50-68 *; | [Y]US5931814 (ALEX RAINER [DE], et al) [Y] 13,19 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 35; figure -; claim - *; | [XYI]US6175763 (SORENSON PAUL D [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,12,18 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 17 * * column 4, lines 58-61 * * column 5, line 58 - column 10, line 37 * * column 11, line 41 - column 12, line 30; figure -; claim - * [Y] 10,11,13-17,19 [I] 2,3,8; | [Y]US2008027296 (HADVARY PAUL [CH], et al) [Y] 13-17* paragraphs [0011] , [0021] - [0022] - [0027] - [0033]; figure -; claim - *; | [YD]US2008086041 (HELLER ADAM [US], et al) [YD] 10,11 * paragraphs [0207] - [0208] - [ 217] - [0218] - [0223] , [ 236] - [0237] *; | [XYI]EP2353640 (NIHON KOHDEN CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] - [0008] - [0011] - [0015] - [0020] , [0027] - [0052]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 13-17,19 [I] 9,12,18; | [Y]EP2436311 (PHARMASENS AG [CH]) [Y] 13-17,19 * paragraphs [0017] , [0024] - [0025] - [0032] - [0046]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP2438938 (PHARMASENS AG [CH]) [Y] 13-17,19 * paragraphs [0019] - [0020] - [0032] - [0033]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP0825882 | WO0215778 | US2008086041 | US8021519 |