EP2864437 - DE-ICER AND/OR ANTI-ICER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esseco UK Limited Calder Vale Road Wakefield, Yorkshire WF1 5PH / GB | [2023/09] |
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states Esseco Uk Limited Calder Vale Road Wakefield, Yorkshire WF1 5PH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCONNELL, Alistair Esseco Uk Limited Calder Vale Road Wakefield Yorkshire WF1 5PH / GB | [2022/09] |
Former [2015/18] | 01 /
McCONNELl, Alistair Esseco Uk Limited Calder Vale Road Wakefield Yorkshire WF1 5PH / GB | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/09] |
Former [2015/18] | Sanderson, Nigel Paul HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13731477.9 | 24.06.2013 | [2023/09] | WO2013GB51647 | Priority number, date | GB20120011060 | 22.06.2012 Original published format: GB 201211060 | GB20120011995 | 05.07.2012 Original published format: GB 201211995 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013190332 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864437 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2864437 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
C09K3/185 (EP,US);
C09K3/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTEISUNGSMITTEL UND/ODER AUFTAUZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND -VERFAHREN | [2015/18] | English: | DE-ICER AND/OR ANTI-ICER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2015/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE DÉVERGLASSAGE ET/OU ANTIVERGLAS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 27.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2019 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.2023
02.01.2024
ADMISSIBLE Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road HX1 2HY West Yorkshire, Halifax / GB Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2024/06] |
Former [2024/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.2023
Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road HX1 2HY West Yorkshire, Halifax / GB Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | 09.01.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.05.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4728393 (PEEL TERENCE E [CA]) [X] 1,40-43 * examples 5,6,8-13,15,17 * * the whole document * [I] 2-39; | [XI]US4746449 (PEEL TERENCE E [CA]) [X] 1,40-43 * examples 5, 6, 8-13,15,17 * * the whole document * [I] 2-39; | [XI]CA1260696 (DOMTAR INC) [X] 1,40-43 * examples 5,6,8,10,11 * * the whole document * [I] 2-39; | [XI]KR20010045160 (KOREA HIGHWAY CORP [KR]) [X] 1,40-43 * abstract *[I] 2-39; | [XI]US2008099716 (KOEFOD ROBERT SCOTT [US]) [X] 1,40-43 * claims 7, 10 - 12 * * the whole document * [I] 2-39; | [XI]WO2009146562 (BIOAMBER SAS [FR], et al) [X] 1,40-43 * claims 1,12, 13, 17 * [I] 2-39 | Opposition | US4728393 | US4746449 | EP0306972 | CA1260696 | US5104562 | US5376293 | WO0105906 | KR20010045160 | US2005230658 | US2008099716 | WO2009146562 | CN101671539 | CN102002341 | KR20120008311 | WO2013190332 | - Johnston Daniel P., David L. Huft, "Sodium Salts of Carboxylic Acids as Alternative Deicers", TRANSPORTATION RESEARCH RECORD 1387, (19930101), pages 67 - 70, XP093147553 | - Bang S. S., Johnston D., "Environmental Effects of Sodium Acetate/Formate Deicer, Ice Shear ", ARCHIVES OF ENVIRONMENTAL CONTAMINATION AND TOXICOLOGY, SPRINGER, NEW YORK,, NY,, US, US , (19981101), vol. 35, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s002449900419, ISSN 0090-4341, pages 580 - 587, XP093147554 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002449900419 | - Anonymous, "Technology Ready for Implementation", South Dakota Department of Transportation Office of Research, (20010501), South Dakota Department of Transportation Office of Research, URL: https://portal.ct.gov/-/media/DOT/documents/dresearch/SD200100FAASHTORACTIGMay2001pdf.pdf, (20240403), XP093147555 | - Anonymous, "Technology Ready for Implementation", South Dakota Department of Transportation Office of Research, (20020601), South Dakota Department of Transportation Office of Research, URL: https://portal.ct.gov/-/media/DOT/documents/dresearch/SD200200FAASHTORACTIGJune2002pdf.pdf, (20240403), XP093147557 | - Shi Xianming, Fay Laura, Gallaway Chase, Volkening Kevin, Peterson Marijean M, Pan Tongyan, Creighton Andrew, Lawlor Collins, Mumma Stephanie, Liu Yajun, Nguyen Tuan Anh, "EVALUATION OF ALTERNATIVE ANTI-ICING AND DEICING COMPOUNDS USING SODIUM CHLORIDE AND MAGNESIUM CHLORIDE AS BASELINE DEICERS - PHASE I", Report No. CDOT-2009-1 Final Report, (20090201), Report No. CDOT-2009-1 Final Report, URL: https://www.codot.gov/programs/research/reports/2009/antiicing.pdf, (20240403), XP093147558 | - Fay Laura, Shi Xianming, "Laboratory Investigation of Performance and Impacts of Snow and Ice Control Chemicals for Winter Road Service", Journal of Cold Regions Engineering, American Society of Civil Engineers, (20110901), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1061/(ASCE)CR.1943-5495.0000025, ISSN 0887-381X, pages 89 - 114, XP093147560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1061/(ASCE)CR.1943-5495.0000025 | - Laura Fay; Xianming Shi, "Environmental Impacts of Chemicals for Snow and Ice Control: State of the Knowledge", Water, Air, and Soil Pollution, Kluwer Academic Publishers, Do, Do , (20120113), vol. 223, no. 5, doi:10.1007/s11270-011-1064-6, ISSN 1573-2932, pages 2751 - 2770, XP035060401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11270-011-1064-6 | - V. P. Danilov; E. A. Frolova; D. F. Kondakov; L. I. Avdushkina; A. V. Bykov; V. T. Orlova, "Low-temperature anti-icing reagents in aqueous salt systems containing acetates and formiates", Theoretical Foundations of Chemical Engineering, Nauka/Interperiodica, Mo, Mo , (20121017), vol. 46, no. 5, doi:10.1134/S0040579512050028, ISSN 1608-3431, pages 528 - 535, XP035125632 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S0040579512050028 | - Danilov V. P., Frolova E. A., Kondakov D. F., Avdyushkina L. I., Bzhov A. V., Orlova V. T., "Low-temperature anti-icing compositions water-salt systems, including acetate! formia™", Khimicheskaya Tekhnologiya, (20110101), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 1684-5811, pages 134 - 141, XP009553679 | - Anonymous, "Temper S", (20040513), URL: https://oookirin.ru/f/temper-s.pdf, (20240403), XP093147577 | - Stefl Barbara A., George Kathleen F., "Antifreezes and Deicing Fluids", Stefl Barbara A., George Kathleen F., Kirk, Raymond Eller ; Othmer, Donald F, Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, Vol 7, US , John Wiley & Sons , doi:10.1002/0471238961.0114200919200506.a01, ISBN 978-0-471-23896-6, XP093147579 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0471238961.0114200919200506.a01 | - Anonymous, "Environmental Impact and Benefit Assessment for the Final Effluent Limitation Guidelines and Standards for the Airport Deicing Category", United States Environmental Protection Agency, (20120401), United States Environmental Protection Agency , URL: https://www.epa.gov/sites/default/files/2015-06/documents/airport-deicing_environmental-impact-and-benefit-assessment-final-2012.pdf, (20240403), XP093147582 | - Anonymous, "Impact of Airport Pavement Deicing Products on Aircraft and Airfield Infrastructure", National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine, Washington, D.C., Transportation Research Board, (20080429), ISBN 978-0-309-09799-4, XP093147589 | - Anonymous, "Alternative Aircraft Anti-Icing Formulations with Reduced Aquatic Toxicity and Biochemical Oxygen Demand", National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine, Washington, D.C., Transportation Research Board, (20100707), ISBN 978-0-309-42997-9, XP093147593 | - Dunn Stanley A, Schenk Roy U, "Alternative Highway Deicing Chemicals", (19800101), pages 261 - 269, URL: https://onlinepubs.trb.org/Onlinepubs/sr/sr185/185-043.pdf, (20240403), XP093147596 |