EP2869756 - HUMIDITY SENSOR FOR MONITORING AN ACCESS TO A PATIENT, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE HUMIDITY SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÜPPER, Andreas Am Brückel 22 64572 Büttelborn / DE | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Frank OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann Wilhelminenstrasse 1a 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Oppermann, Frank OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann LLP Washingtonstrasse 75 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 13732359.8 | 21.06.2013 | [2017/39] | WO2013EP01843 | Priority number, date | DE20121013471 | 09.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012013471 | US201261669162P | 09.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261669162 P | [2015/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014008981 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2869756 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2869756 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, G01M3/16 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
G01M3/16 (EP,US);
A61M5/5086 (US);
A61B5/02042 (EP,US);
A61M1/3656 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1588 (EP,US);
A61M2205/15 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUCHTIGKEITSSENSOR ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES ZUGANGS ZU EINEM PATIENTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES FEUCHTIGKEITSSENSORS | [2015/20] | English: | HUMIDITY SENSOR FOR MONITORING AN ACCESS TO A PATIENT, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE HUMIDITY SENSOR | [2015/20] | French: | CAPTEUR D'HUMIDITÉ POUR SURVEILLER UN ACCÈS À UN PATIENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DU CAPTEUR D'HUMIDITÉ | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 09.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2013 | AL | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | ES | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | MT | 27.09.2017 | NL | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | RS | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | AT | 21.06.2018 | GB | 21.06.2018 | IE | 21.06.2018 | LU | 21.06.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
AT | 21.06.2018 | ||
GB | 21.06.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
AT | 21.06.2018 | ||
GB | 21.06.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
AT | 21.06.2018 | ||
GB | 21.06.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
AT | 21.06.2018 | ||
GB | 21.06.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
AT | 21.06.2018 | ||
GB | 21.06.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 21.06.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002198483 (WARIAR RAMESH [US], et al) [A] 1,13* paragraphs [0058] - [0067] *; | [A]WO2006008866 (AWAJITEC KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 *; | [AD]WO2010091852 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 20, line 10 - page 22, line 28 * * figures 1-5 *; | [AD]WO2011116943 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 18, line 23 - page 22, line 9 * * page 27, lines 1-15 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102010024654 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0058] - [0068] * * figures 1-4 * | Examination | US4298855 | by applicant | WO2010091852 | WO2011116943 | DE102010023132 |