EP2862383 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SUPPORTING LOAD BALANCING OF IDLE MODE MOBILE RADIO TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/17] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SUPPORTING IDLE MODE LOAD BALANCING | ||
[2018/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRIDHAR, Kamakshi 3400 W. Plano Parkway Plano, TX 75075 / US | 02 /
SEYMOUR, James, P. 510 Mallard Point North Aurora, IL 60542 / US | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2015/17] | Application number, filing date | 13732735.9 | 11.06.2013 | WO2013US45165 | Priority number, date | US201213517765 | 14.06.2012 Original published format: US201213517765 | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013188392 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2862383 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/08 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
H04L5/0044 (EP,CN,US);
H04W28/09 (KR);
H04L5/0071 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0089 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W28/0284 (KR);
H04W28/0958 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | H04W24/08, H04W28/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES LASTAUSGLEICHS VON IDLE MODE MOBILFUNKENDGERÄTEN | [2018/42] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SUPPORTING LOAD BALANCING OF IDLE MODE MOBILE RADIO TERMINALS | [2018/42] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉQUILIBRAGE DE CHARGE DES TERMINAUX DE RADIOTÉLÉPHONIE MOBILE DANS MODE IDLE | [2018/42] |
Former [2015/17] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES LEERLAUFMODUS-LASTAUSGLEICHS | ||
Former [2015/17] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SUPPORTING IDLE MODE LOAD BALANCING | ||
Former [2015/17] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRISE EN CHARGE D'ÉQUILIBRAGE DE CHARGE EN MODE VEILLE | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 01.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.09.2018 | 21.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2011176424 (YANG XUEJUN [CH], et al) [I] 8 * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0111]; figures 5,6 *; | [I] - HUAWEI, "Idle mode Inter RAT load balancing", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-080757_IDLE MODE INTER RAT LOAD BALANCING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080326), vol. RAN WG3, no. Shenzhen, China; 20080326, XP050163964 [I] 8 * page 1 - page 4 * | [A] - HUAWEI, "IDLE mode counting for camp load balancing", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-074799, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071112), vol. RAN WG2, no. Jeju; 20071112, XP050137309 [A] 8 * page 1 - page 4 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Self-configuring and self-optimizing network (SON) use cases and solutions (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 36.902, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110401), no. V9.3.1, pages 1 - 21, XP050477264 [A] 8 * paragraph [04.6] - paragraph [4.6.6.3] * | [A] - Krzysztof Kordybach ET AL, "Self Organizing Networks (SON)", LTE for UMTS: Evoluation to LTE-Advanced, John Wiley and Sons, (20110304), pages 237 - 255, doi:10.1002/9781119992943.ch9, ISBN 978-0-47-066000-3, XP055091506 [A] 8 * paragraph [9.5.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9781119992943.ch9 | [A] - Daniela Laselva ET AL, "Self-Optimisation", LTE Self-Organising Networks (SON), Chichester, UK, John Wiley & Sons, Ltd, (20111209), pages 135 - 234, doi:10.1002/9781119961789.ch5, ISBN 978-1-11-997067-5, XP055091508 [A] 8 * page 157, paragraph 5.2 - page 193, paragraph 5.2.7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9781119961789.ch5 |