EP3005290 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT MODELING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Longsand Limited Autonomy House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANCHFLOWER, Sean c/o Autonomy House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WZ / GB | 02 /
SAKLATVALA, George c/o Autonomy House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WZ / GB | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13733233.4 | 31.05.2013 | [2016/15] | WO2013EP61324 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014191055 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005290 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
G06T15/50 (EP,US);
G06T17/10 (US);
G06T19/20 (EP,US);
G06T7/55 (EP,US);
G06T7/97 (EP,US);
G06T2200/04 (US);
G06T2200/08 (EP,US);
G06T2200/21 (US);
G06T2200/24 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10004 (US);
G06T2207/10028 (US);
G06T2207/20092 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | MODELLIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER GEGENSTÄNDE | [2016/15] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT MODELING | [2016/15] | French: | MODÉLISATION D'OBJETS TRIDIMENSIONNELS | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 26.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2004189686 (TANGUAY DONALD O [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraphs [0046] , [0 48] , [0 50] * * paragraph [0053] * * figures 1, 3C * [A] 3-5,8 [I] 7,10,12-14; | [X]US2013136341 (YAMAMOTO KOJI [JP]) [X] 1,8,11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] * * figures 4, 5, 9 *; | [A] - WENDEL A ET AL, "Dense reconstruction on-the-fly", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), 2012 IEEE CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120616), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2012.6247833, ISBN 978-1-4673-1226-4, pages 1450 - 1457, XP032232232 [A] 3-5 * abstract * * section 3.1 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2012.6247833 |