EP2800613 - SKATEBOARD TRUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reincarnate, Inc. 12845 Starwood Lane San Diego, CA 92131 / US | [2014/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERMAL, Jay, Velitario 9974 Scripps Ranch Blv 1-155 San-Diego, CA 92131 / US | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 13733602.0 | 03.01.2013 | WO2013US20158 | Priority number, date | US201261583780P | 06.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261583780 P | US201213727498 | 26.12.2012 Original published format: US201213727498 | [2014/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013103729 | Date: | 11.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800613 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A63C17/00, A63C17/26, A63C17/12, A63C17/01, B62M1/00 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
A63C17/012 (EP,CN,US);
B62M1/00 (US);
A63C17/0093 (EP,US);
A63C17/014 (EP,CN,US);
A63C17/015 (EP,US);
A63C17/0033 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/46] | A63C17/00, A63C17/26, A63C17/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Title | German: | SKATEBOARDACHSE | [2014/46] | English: | SKATEBOARD TRUCK | [2014/46] | French: | AXE DE PLANCHE À ROULETTES | [2016/16] |
Former [2014/46] | ROULETTE DE PLANCHE À ROULETTES | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 24.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 09.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5833252 (STRAND STEEN [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 10; figures 3,5,6,7 *; | [A]US5924710 (DE COURCEY MILNE JOHN [AU]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 25; figures 3-8 *; | [A]WO9954006 (JUNG HAE TAEK [KR]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 4; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP1093388 (MATTEL INC [US]) [A] 1-15* figure 3b; claim 1 *; | [A]US6341790 (CHEN CHIH-LIANG [TW]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 8 - column 2, line 65; figures 2,3 *; | [A]FR2896432 (LE MI [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 29; figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]US5513865 (BROOKS PAUL F [US], et al); | [A]US5833252 (STRAND STEEN [US]); | [A]US5924710 (DE COURCEY MILNE JOHN [AU]); | [A]EP1093388 (MATTEL INC [US]); | [A]KR100452140B (JUNG, JIN HWA) |