EP2656830 - AUTOMATIC MEDICINE PACKAGING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVM Co., Ltd. 357-96 Hosan-dong Dalseo-gu Daegu 704-900 / KR | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jun Ho 102-102 Beomeo Woobang Lecon 92-2 Beomeo 4-dong Suseong-gu Daegu 706-819 / KR | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13733941.2 | 08.01.2013 | WO2013KR00119 | Priority number, date | KR20120006824 | 20.01.2012 Original published format: KR 20120006824 | [2013/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013109013 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2656830 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61J3/00, B65B1/30 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
G07F17/0092 (EP);
B65B5/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE MEDIZINVERPACKUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/44] | English: | AUTOMATIC MEDICINE PACKAGING APPARATUS | [2013/44] | French: | APPAREIL D'EMBALLAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2013 | Translation filed | 12.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 08.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004226855 (KIM JUN HO [KR]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-8 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0 12] , [0 23] , [0 26] * [I] 6-11; | [XI]US2003156925 (KIM JUN HO [KR]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [I] 5-11 | International search | [X]JPH09201399 (YUYAMA SEISAKUSHO KK); | [X]KR20110124968 (CRETEM CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20090112540 (JVM CO.,LTD.); | [A]JPH045841U (SHOJI, UYAMA) | by applicant | KR100498727B | KR200274355Y |