EP2855733 - METHOD FOR COATING A SUBSTRATE CONTAINING COBALT, NICKEL AND/OR IRON WITH A CORROSION-RESISTANT LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DECHEMA-Forschungsinstitut Theodor-Heuss-Allee 25 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states DECHEMA -Forschungsinstitut Theodor-Heuss-Allee 25 60486 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALETZ, Mathias Rödelheimerstrasse 34 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
SCHÜTZE, Michael Steinrückenstrasse 25 a 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | 03 /
MONTERO, Xabier Neuhofstrasse 28 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Hebing, Norbert Patentanwalt Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [2015/15] | Application number, filing date | 13734317.4 | 29.05.2013 | [2017/50] | WO2013DE00295 | Priority number, date | DE20121010602 | 30.05.2012 Original published format: DE102012010602 | [2015/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013178216 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2855733 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2855733 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/10 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
C23C24/106 (EP,US);
C23C10/60 (US);
C23C10/02 (US);
C23C10/26 (EP);
C23C10/28 (EP,US);
C23C18/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN EINES KOBALT-, NICKEL- UND/ODER EISENHALTIGEN SUBSTRATS MIT EINER KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGEN SCHICHT | [2015/15] | English: | METHOD FOR COATING A SUBSTRATE CONTAINING COBALT, NICKEL AND/OR IRON WITH A CORROSION-RESISTANT LAYER | [2015/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RECOUVRIR UN SUBSTRAT À BASE DE COBALT, DE NICKEL ET/OU DE FER D'UNE COUCHE RÉSISTANT À LA CORROSION | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 05.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2013 | AL | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | ES | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | IT | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | MT | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | RS | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | AT | 29.05.2018 | IE | 29.05.2018 | LU | 29.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.05.2013 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MK | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
AT | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.05.2013 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
AT | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
AT | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
AT | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
AT | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2927043 (STETSON ALVIN R) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 34 - page 5, line 59 * * column 6, lines 25-68; claim - *; | [A]DE2141663 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 1-14 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]DE2903080 (TOYO KOGYO CO) [A] 1-14* claim - *; | [A]CN1397664 (UNIV XI AN JIAOTONG [CN]) [A] 1-14 * pages 2,3; claim - * | by applicant | US3102044 | US3248251 | US3257230 | US3544348 | US5547770 | US5650235 | US6126758 |