EP2873110 - FLUORINATED CARBONYL COMPOUNDS COMPRISING A TRIPLE BOND, METHODS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY SA Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOMKAMP, Martin 38 Vossstrasse 30161 Hannover / DE | 02 /
SEFFER, Dirk Freundallee 3 B 30173 Hannover / DE | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Mross, Stefan P.M., et al Solvay SA Intellectual Assets Management RIC Lyon 85 avenue des Frères Perret, BP 62 69182 Saint-Fons / FR | [2016/51] |
Former [2015/21] | Mross, Stefan P.M., et al Solvay S.A. Departement Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 13734454.5 | 09.07.2013 | [2016/51] | WO2013EP64504 | Priority number, date | EP20120176268 | 13.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12176268 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014009377 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873110 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2873110 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0567, C07C69/96, H01M10/0569, H01G11/60, H01G11/64, H01M10/052, C07C253/30, C07C255/03, C07C255/14, H01G11/62 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
C07C69/96 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C255/03 (US);
C07C253/30 (US);
C07C255/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07C68/02 (KR);
C07C69/04 (KR);
H01G11/60 (EP,CN,US);
H01G11/62 (US);
H01G11/64 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,CN,US);
H01M12/08 (US);
H01M2300/0034 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/13 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | H01M10/0567, C07C68/02, C07C69/04, C07C69/96, H01M10/0569, H01G11/60, H01G11/64, H01M10/052, C07C253/30, C07C255/03, C07C255/14, H01G11/62 | ||
Former IPC [2015/21] | H01M10/0567, C07C68/02, C07C69/04, C07C69/96, H01M10/0569, H01G11/60, H01G11/64, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORINIERTE CARBONYLVERBINDUNGEN MIT EINER DREIFACHBINDUNG, VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2016/17] | English: | FLUORINATED CARBONYL COMPOUNDS COMPRISING A TRIPLE BOND, METHODS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE AND USES THEREOF | [2015/21] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE CARBONYLE FLUORÉS COMPRENANT UNE TRIPLE LIAISON, PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR FABRICATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2016/17] |
Former [2015/21] | FLUORIERTE CARBONYLVERBINDUNGEN MIT EINER DREIFACHBINDUNG, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2015/21] | COMPOSÉS DE CARBONYLE FLUORÉ COMPORTANT UNE LIAISON TRIPLE, LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 26.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2013 | AL | 21.12.2016 | AT | 21.12.2016 | BE | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | ES | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | PL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | RS | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | TR | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | NO | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | IE | 09.07.2017 | LU | 09.07.2017 | MT | 09.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
TR | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 09.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 21.12.2016 | |
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1890357 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,11-15 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0139] * [I] 6,7,9,10; | [I]EP2253710 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [I] 9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0004] *; | [I]JP2001002624 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [I] 9,10 * paragraph [0009] * | by applicant | WO2007042471 | WO2011006822 | US6489064 | US6677085 |