EP2865183 - METHOD OF ADAPTING 3D CONTENT TO AN OBSERVER WEARING PRESCRIPTION GLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2022/44] |
Former [2021/08] | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLONDE, Laurent c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
THIEBAUD, Sylvain c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 03 /
DOYEN, Didier c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Interdigital 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2015/18] | Aumonier, Sebastien 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 13734685.4 | 24.06.2013 | [2022/23] | WO2013EP63150 | Priority number, date | EP20120305741 | 26.06.2012 Original published format: EP 12305741 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014001262 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2865183 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2865183 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/128 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
H04N13/30 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/128 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/0075 (EP,US);
H04N13/144 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/271 (KR);
H04N13/332 (KR);
H04N2013/0081 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H04N13/10 | ||
Former IPC [2015/18] | H04N13/00, H04N13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANPASSUNG EINES 3D-INHALTS AN EINEN BETRACHTER MIT BRILLE | [2015/18] | English: | METHOD OF ADAPTING 3D CONTENT TO AN OBSERVER WEARING PRESCRIPTION GLASSES | [2015/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ADAPTATION DE CONTENU 3D POUR UN OBSERVATEUR PORTANT DES LUNETTES avec prescription | [2021/01] |
Former [2015/18] | PROCÉDÉ POUR ADAPTER UN CONTENU EN 3D À LA VUE D'UN SPECTATEUR QUI PORTE DES VERRES PRESCRITS SUR ORDONNANCE | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 31.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2013 | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CY | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | ES | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | IT | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | MK | 08.06.2022 | MT | 08.06.2022 | NL | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | IE | 24.06.2022 | LU | 24.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.06.2013 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
MK | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.06.2013 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.06.2013 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
LU | 24.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 24.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003284093 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [I]EP1901564 (NTT DATA SANYO SYSTEM CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0026] , [0031] * * paragraph [0042]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0062] , [0075] *; | [A] - HESS L ET AL, "Computer binocular kit: the return", CYBERNETIC VISION, 1996. PROCEEDINGS., SECOND WORKSHOP ON SAO CARLOS, BRAZIL 9-11 DEC. 1996, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19961209), ISBN 978-0-8186-8058-8, pages 131 - 133, XP010251592 [A] 1,8 * the whole document * | Examination | US2011074933 | US2011261314 | by applicant | WO2012156489 | EP2547109 | - D. DOYEN ET AL., "The Use of a Dense Disparity Map to Enhance Quality of Experience in Stereoscopic 3D Content", PROCEEDINGS OF SMPTE 2011 CONFERENCE |