EP2867878 - METHODS OF PROVIDING TRAFFIC FLOW MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TomTom Traffic B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | [2018/42] |
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states TomTom Development Germany GmbH Maximilianallee 4 04129 Leipzig / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KESTING, Arne Kleine Hamburger Str. 25A 10115 Berlin / DE | 02 /
LORKOWSKI, Stefan Germanenstr. 3 12 524 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SCHILLING, David Plesser Str. 9 12 435 Berlin / DE | 04 /
WITTE, Nikolaus Sonnenburgerstr. 58A 10 437 Berlin / DE | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Terry, Martin Albert Mortimer, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Dobson, Adrian TomTom International B.V. IP Creation De Ruyterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 13734715.9 | 01.07.2013 | WO2013EP63789 | Priority number, date | GB20120011618 | 29.06.2012 Original published format: GB 201211618 | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014001561 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2867878 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
G08G1/012 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G08G1/01 (US);
G08G1/0112 (KR);
G08G1/0141 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON VERKEHRSFLUSSNACHRICHTEN | [2015/19] | English: | METHODS OF PROVIDING TRAFFIC FLOW MESSAGES | [2015/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'OBTENTION DE MESSAGES DE FLUX DE TRAFIC | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 14.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 04.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/26] | 20.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.05.2019 | 23.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2016 | Request for further processing for: | 04.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 04.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2784486 (MORENO ROLAND [FR]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005222751 (UYEKI ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0010] , [0083] , [0124] *; | [XA]DE102006041668 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,19-22 * paragraph [0013] * [A] 2-18; | [A]US2011106416 (SCOFIELD CHRISTOPHER LAURENCE [US], et al) [A] 1-22* paragraphs [0021] , [0033] *; | [X]US8180558 (MARKO PAUL D [US]) [X] 1-22 * column 4, line 45 - column 8, line 5; figures 1-3 * |