EP2863791 - MULTI-LUMEN-CATHETER RETRACTOR SYSTEM FOR A MINIMALLY-INVASIVE, OPERATIVE GASTROINTESTINAL TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2020/17] |
Former [2017/19] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | ||
Former [2017/17] | For all designated states LumenR, LLC 6222 Thornton Avenue Newark, CA 94560 / US | ||
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states Macroplata, Inc. 113 Laredo Drive Morganville, NJ 07751 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PISKUN, Gregory 113 Laredo Drive Morganville, NJ 07751 / US | 02 /
TO, John 36514 Dijon Drive Newark, CA 94560 / US | 03 /
FABRO, Mariel 4448 24th Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 04 /
TANG, Brian 47441 Hoyt Street Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 05 /
KANTSEVOY, Sergey 4 Melisa Court Owings Mills, MD 21117 / US | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/17] |
Former [2015/18] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13735103.7 | 17.06.2013 | [2020/17] | WO2013US46200 | Priority number, date | US201213531477 | 22.06.2012 Original published format: US201213531477 | US201313913466 | 09.06.2013 Original published format: US201313913466 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013192116 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2863791 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2863791 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B17/02, A61B1/018, A61B1/00, A61B1/31 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
A61B1/00087 (EP);
A61B17/3421 (EP,CN);
A61B1/00135 (EP);
A61B1/00154 (EP);
A61B17/0218 (EP);
A61B1/31 (EP);
A61B17/083 (EP);
A61B17/122 (EP);
A61B17/1285 (EP);
A61B2017/00278 (EP);
A61B2017/00287 (EP);
A61B2017/00296 (EP);
A61B2017/00323 (EP);
A61B2017/00336 (EP);
A61B2017/00818 (EP);
A61B2017/00902 (EP);
A61B2017/2212 (EP);
A61B2017/2905 (EP);
A61B2017/3445 (EP,CN);
A61B2017/3447 (EP,CN);
A61B2017/345 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | A61B1/00, A61B1/018, A61B17/02, A61B17/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RETRAKTORSYSTEM FÜR MULTILUMEN-KATHETER FÜR MINIMAL INVASIVE CHIRURGISCHE GASTROINTESTINALE BEHANDLUNG | [2015/18] | English: | MULTI-LUMEN-CATHETER RETRACTOR SYSTEM FOR A MINIMALLY-INVASIVE, OPERATIVE GASTROINTESTINAL TREATMENT | [2015/18] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCARTEUR DE CATHÉTER À LUMIÈRES MULTIPLES POUR UN TRAITEMENT GASTRO-INTESTINAL CHIRURGICAL MINIMALEMENT INVASIF | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 15.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20152314.9 / EP3669745 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2013 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | LU | 17.06.2020 | FR | 22.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.06.2013 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
FR | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
FR | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
FR | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5386817 (JONES JEFFREY S [US]); | [A]US2003023143 (ABE MASANAO [JP], et al); | [A]US2006189845 (MAAHS TRACY D [US], et al); | [XY]WO2011084616 (MACROPLATA INC [US], et al); | [A]US2012109178 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) | Examination | US2003074015 | by applicant | US20100970604 |