EP2870261 - BIOMARKERS ASSOCIATED WITH CDK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For all designated states Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215-5450 / US | For all designated states Broad Institute 44 Binney Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPONIGRO, Giordano Novartis Institutes for BioMedical Research, Inc. 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
DELACH, Scott Novartis Institutes for BioMedical Research, Inc. 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
GARRAWAY, Levi Dana-Farber Cancer Institute Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215-5450 / US | 04 /
JAGANI, Zainab Novartis Institutes for BioMedical Research, Inc. 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 05 /
KIM, Sunkyu Novartis Institutes for BioMedical Research, Inc. 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 06 /
KRYUKOV, Gregory Broad Institute, Inc. 7 Cambridge Center Cambridge, MA 02143 / US | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Bucher, Tamaris Clare, et al Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Kassow, Anders, et al Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13735529.3 | 26.06.2013 | [2017/49] | WO2013US47925 | Priority number, date | US201261669534P | 09.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261669534 P | [2015/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014011398 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2870261 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2870261 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/5011 (US);
G01N33/57496 (US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/16 (US);
G01N2333/4739 (US);
G01N2440/14 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT CDK-INHIBITOREN ASSOZIIERTE BIOMARKER | [2015/20] | English: | BIOMARKERS ASSOCIATED WITH CDK INHIBITORS | [2015/20] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS ASSOCIES AUX INHIBITEURS DE KINASES CYCLINE-DEPENDANTES. | [2017/28] |
Former [2015/20] | BIOMARQUEURS ASSOCIÉS À DES INHIBITEURS DE CDK | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 10.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17198700.1 / EP3309263 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2013 | AL | 06.12.2017 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | RS | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | IE | 26.06.2018 | LU | 26.06.2018 | MT | 26.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
MT | 26.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
MT | 26.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
MT | 26.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
MT | 26.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
MT | 26.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2009150491 (PIRAMAL LIFE SCIENCES LTD [IN], et al) [I] 1-36 * claims 1,2 * * abstract * | [I] - ANA-TERESA MAIA ET AL, "Extent of differential allelic expression of candidate breast cancer genes is similar in blood and breast", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH, (20090101), vol. 11, no. 6, doi:10.1186/bcr2458, ISSN 1465-5411, page R88, XP055018549 [I] 37 * abstract * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/bcr2458 | Examination | - AFFYMETRIX, "Data Sheet Affymetrix(R) Genome-Wide Human SNP Array 6.0", INTERNET CITATION, (2007), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.affymetrix.com/support/technical/datasheets/genomewide_snp6_datasheet.pdf, (20090410), XP002525407 | - K. E. Berquam-Vrieze ET AL, "Cell of origin strongly influences genetic selection in a mouse model of T-ALL", Blood, US, (20110809), vol. 118, no. 17, doi:10.1182/blood-2011-03-343947, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4646 - 4656, XP055271697 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2011-03-343947 | by applicant | WO9710365 | US5405783 | US5412087 | US5445934 | US4683195 | US4683203 | US5578832 | US5631734 | US3817837 | US3850752 | US3939350 | US3996345 | US4277437 | US4275149 | US4366241 | - XIONG ET AL., GENOMICS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 575 - 584 | - MOTOKURA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 20412 - 20415 | - BATES ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1994), vol. 9, pages 71 - 79 | - SHERR, TRENDS IN BIO.SCI, (1995), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 187 - 190 | - SAVAS ET AL., OMICS, (2007), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 200 - 208 | - SICINSKA ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2003), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 451 - 461 | - PASQUALUCCI ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (2011), vol. 43, no. 9, pages 830 - 837 | - MORIN, NATURE, (2011), vol. 476, pages 298 - 303 | - SAIKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, page 487 | - ORITA ET AL., PNAS, (1989), vol. 86, pages 2766 - 2770 | - LUCA ET AL., PNAS USA, (1986), vol. 83, no. 4 | - "Hybridization with Nucleic Acid Probes", Laboratory Techniques in Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, ELSEVIER, (1993), vol. 24 | - BARRETINA J.; CAPONIGRO G. ET AL., "The Cancer Cell Line Encyclopedia: using preclinical models to predict anticancer drug sensitivity", NATURE, (2012), vol. 483, no. 7391, pages 603 - 607 | - LI ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2010), vol. 25, pages 1754 - 60 | - DEPRISTO ET AL., NAT GENET, (2011), vol. 43, pages 491 - 8 | - SHERRY ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2001), vol. 29, pages 308 - 11 | - FRY ET AL., MOL. CANCER THER., (2004), vol. 3, no. 11, pages 1427 - 1438 |