EP2803269 - COMPOSITION FOR CONTROLLING PLANT DISEASE AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company Limited 27-1 Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUZAKI, Yuichi c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 2-1 Takatsukasa 4-chome Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665-8555 / JP | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13736207.5 | 08.01.2013 | WO2013JP50077 | Priority number, date | JP20120001917 | 10.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012001917 | [2014/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013105542 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2803269 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/58, A01N43/90, A01P3/00 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
A01N43/58 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/58, A01N43/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PFLANZENBEFALL UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2014/47] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR CONTROLLING PLANT DISEASE AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2014/47] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LUTTER CONTRE UNE MALADIE DE PLANTE ET APPLICATION DE CETTE COMPOSITION | [2014/47] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2014 | Translation filed | 24.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 13.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]WO2005121104 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2006001175 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2012020772 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2012020774 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2012020776 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2012020778 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | by applicant | WO2005121104 | WO2006001175 |