EP2804022 - PROXIMITY SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2014/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Yosuke c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13736429.5 | 11.01.2013 | WO2013JP00094 | Priority number, date | JP20120005554 | 13.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012005554 | [2014/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013105510 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2804022 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/20, G01C3/06, H01L23/12, H05K3/08, G01J1/02, G01J1/42, H03K17/94, G01S17/02, G01S7/481, G06F3/03, H05K1/02, H05K3/10, G06F3/0354, // H03K17/945 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
G01V8/20 (EP,US);
G01B11/14 (US);
G01J1/429 (US);
G01J5/0025 (EP,US);
G01J5/0808 (EP,US);
G01J5/0868 (EP,US);
G01J5/0896 (EP,US);
G01S17/00 (US);
G01S17/04 (EP,US);
G01S7/4813 (EP,US);
G01S7/4815 (EP,US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,US);
G06F3/03547 (EP,US);
H03K17/943 (EP,US);
H05K1/0284 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15156 (EP,US);
H03K2017/9455 (EP,US);
H03K2217/94111 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0338 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10151 (EP,US);
H05K2201/2054 (EP,US);
H05K3/108 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/47] | G01V8/20, G01C3/06, H01L23/12, H05K3/08, G01J1/02, G01J1/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Title | German: | NÄHERUNGSSENSOR | [2014/47] | English: | PROXIMITY SENSOR | [2014/47] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PROXIMITÉ | [2014/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2014 | Translation filed | 11.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 08.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH10148640 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,4,8 * figures 1, 9, 10 * [I] 5; | [A]JP2000075046 (ROHM CO LTD) [A] 2,3 * figure 3 *; | [A]JP2002131051 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 5* abstract *; | [A]JP2008059200 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 2,3 * abstract *; | [XI]US2011063213 (KANG SUNG HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,8 * figures 2, 3,5 * * paragraph [0033] * [I] 2,3,5-7 | International search | [Y]JPH09203631 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JPH10148640 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2000075046 (ROHM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001188087 (BANDAI CO); | [Y]JP2002131051 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]WO2007099611 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2008059200 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) | by applicant | JP2009099950 |