EP2885797 - LOAD TRANSFER SWITCH, ON-LOAD TAP CHANGER, AND METHOD FOR SWITCHING AN ON-LOAD TAP CHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Reinhausen GmbH Falkensteinstrasse 8 93059 Regensburg / DE | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMER, Christian Hirtenstrasse 6 Regensburg 93059 / DE | 02 /
SACHSENHAUSER, Andreas Ascholtshausen 20 84066 Mallersdorf-Pfaffenberg / DE | [2015/26] | Application number, filing date | 13736564.9 | 11.07.2013 | WO2013EP64668 | Priority number, date | DE201210107446 | 14.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012107446 | [2015/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014026805 | Date: | 20.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2885797 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01F29/04, H01H9/00 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
H01H9/0016 (EP,US);
H01F29/04 (EP,US);
H01H9/0027 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Title | German: | LASTUMSCHALTER, LASTSTUFENSCHALTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM UMSCHALTEN EINES LASTSTUFENSCHALTERS | [2015/26] | English: | LOAD TRANSFER SWITCH, ON-LOAD TAP CHANGER, AND METHOD FOR SWITCHING AN ON-LOAD TAP CHANGER | [2015/26] | French: | COMMUTATEUR DE CHARGE, COMMUTATEUR D'ÉTAGE DE CHARGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA COMMUTATION D'UN COMMUTATEUR D'ÉTAGE DE CHARGE | [2015/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 04.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2021575 (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG) [A] 1-9 * pages 1,2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2604344 (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK) [A] 1-9 * pages 3,4; figures 1-4 *; | [AP]WO2012136423 (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK [DE], et al) [AP] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]DE102009048813 (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]DE102006061601 (AREVA ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3 *; | [AD]DE19510809 (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19510809 | DE4011019 | DE4231353 | DE102007004530 | DE102007023124 |