EP2884831 - WORKING TOOL FOR SOIL WORKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/26] | CROP-PRODUCTION TOOL | ||
[2019/32] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Betek GmbH & Co. KG Sulgener Strasse 21-23 78733 Aichhalden / DE | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMEETS, Florian Baiersbronner Str. 57 72270 Baiersbronn / DE | 02 /
FRIEDERICHS, Heiko Zubermoosstr. 79/1 78733 Aichhalden / DE | [2015/30] |
Former [2015/26] | 01 /
SMEETS, Florian Baiersbronner Str. 57 72270 Baiersbronn / DE | ||
02 /
FRIEDERICHS, Heiko Eichenweg 20 78733 Aichhalden / DE | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Jochen, et al Herrmann Patentanwälte Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 13736908.8 | 12.07.2013 | WO2013EP64803 | Priority number, date | DE201210107476 | 15.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012107476 | [2015/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014026815 | Date: | 20.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2884831 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01B39/22, A01B76/00, A01B35/22 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A01B23/02 (EP);
A01B35/225 (EP,RU,US);
A01B39/22 (RU,US);
A01B61/044 (RU);
A01B76/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/26] | A01B35/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Title | German: | BEARBEITUNGSWERKZEUG FÜR DEN FELDBAU | [2015/26] | English: | WORKING TOOL FOR SOIL WORKING | [2019/37] | French: | OUTIL POUR LE TRAVAIL DES CHAMPS | [2015/26] |
Former [2015/26] | CROP-PRODUCTION TOOL | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 25.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 10.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US1514782 (NOBLES GIDEON L, et al) [X] 1,3-8,10,12,14-17 * page 1, line 32 - line 49 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 9,13; | [XI]US2904119 (HUNTER GEORGE D) [X] 1-4,12-17 * column 2, line 9 - line 36 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 5-7,11; | [X]US3259087 (HORTON DOUELSON B) [X] 1-4,8,12-17 * column 4, lines 4-33,58-65 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US4190115 (COUTURE RICHARD B [CA]) [X] 1,3,8,12,14,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 48 - line 66 * * column 2, line 1 - line 24 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]CA2377475 (ELOCK ALLEN D [CA], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document * |