13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
05.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
22.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
12.10.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
27.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
03.11.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
22.09.2017 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
22.09.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.08.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
02.08.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
02.08.2017 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.07.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.07.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
13.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
10.04.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
12.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
24.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
23.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|