EP2874826 - BEARING FOR A WHEEL HUB AND BEARING UNIT FOR A WHEEL HUB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/22] | WHEEL BEARING ELEMENT AND WHEEL BEARING UNIT | ||
[2016/45] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2018/09] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 41 550 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSCO, Domenico Via Tibaldi 53 I-10071 Borgaro Torinese / IT | 02 /
MAHR, Reinhold Blütenstraße 14 97491 Aidhausen / DE | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Kuhstrebe, Jochen SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Straße 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [2018/09] |
Former [2015/22] | Kuhstrebe, Jochen SKF GmbH IA&IP Gunnar-Wester-Straße 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 13737169.6 | 01.07.2013 | [2018/09] | WO2013EP63807 | Priority number, date | DE201210212687 | 19.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012212687 | [2015/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014012777 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2874826 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2874826 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60B27/00, F16C19/18 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
B60B27/00 (EP);
B60B27/0047 (EP);
B60B27/0078 (EP);
B60B27/0094 (EP);
F16C19/185 (EP);
B60B27/0005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADLAGERELEMENT UND RADLAGEREINHEIT | [2015/22] | English: | BEARING FOR A WHEEL HUB AND BEARING UNIT FOR A WHEEL HUB | [2016/45] | French: | ROULEMENT DE ROUE ET ENSEMBLE DE ROULEMENT DE ROUE | [2016/45] |
Former [2015/22] | WHEEL BEARING ELEMENT AND WHEEL BEARING UNIT | ||
Former [2015/22] | ELÉMENT DE ROULEMENT DE ROUE ET ENSEMBLE ROULEMENT DE ROUE | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 28.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.11.2018
ADMISSIBLE NTN-SNR Roulements 1 Rue des Usines 74000 Annecy / FR Opponent's representative Alatis 3, rue Paul Escudier 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.11.2018
ADMISSIBLE NTN-SNR Roulements 1 Rue des Usines 74000 Annecy / FR Opponent's representative Alatis 109 Bd Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | 19.12.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.04.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2020 | 02.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.06.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/43] | 16.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2013 | AL | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | IT | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | MT | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | NO | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | AT | 01.07.2018 | GB | 01.07.2018 | IE | 01.07.2018 | LU | 01.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | FR | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
AT | 01.07.2018 | ||
GB | 01.07.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
AT | 01.07.2018 | ||
GB | 01.07.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
AT | 01.07.2018 | ||
GB | 01.07.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
AT | 01.07.2018 | ||
GB | 01.07.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 01.07.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 01.07.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 01.07.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 01.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2172553 (SKF CIE APPLIC MECANIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,4-6,8 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0057348 (SKF CIE APPLIC MECANIQUE [FR]) [Y] 7 * page 5, line 8 - line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH07317777 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [XY]DE102008022936 (SKF AB [SE]) [X] 1,3-6,8,10 * paragraph [0033]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 7 | Opposition | DE102008022936 | FR2172553 | EP0057348 | EP0568958 | US2011187179 | US2012104837 | DE102009043269 | DE102006029604 | FR2899293 | - "Elastomer", Wikipedia, (20180424), URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Elastomer&oldid=176819497, XP055536074 |