EP2868086 - VIDEO PARAMETER SET FOR HEVC AND EXTENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ying 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
WANG, Ye-Kui 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Bentall, Mark James, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Bentall, Mark James, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13737509.3 | 02.07.2013 | WO2013US49126 | Priority number, date | US201261667387P | 02.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261667387 P | US201261669587P | 09.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261669587 P | US201361798135P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361798135 P | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 Original published format: US201313932960 | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014008290 | Date: | 09.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2868086 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/00 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
G06T1/00 (RU);
H04N19/597 (CN,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/13 (RU,US);
G06T9/00 (RU);
H04N19/117 (US);
H04N19/124 (US);
H04N19/134 (RU);
H04N19/176 (KR);
H04N19/184 (RU,US);
H04N19/187 (RU);
H04N19/30 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/46 (KR,RU);
H04N19/50 (RU);
H04N19/51 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | VIDEOPARAMETERSATZ FÜR HEVC UND ERWEITERUNGEN | [2015/19] | English: | VIDEO PARAMETER SET FOR HEVC AND EXTENSIONS | [2015/19] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE PARAMÈTRES VIDÉO POUR CODAGE VIDÉO À HAUTE EFFICACITÉ ET EXTENSIONS | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 20.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.06.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/27] | 24.05.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/27] | Appeal following examination | 03.09.2020 | Appeal received No. T2021/20 | 16.11.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.05.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | EP17160607.2 / EP3200465 | EP23212296.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 03.01.2024 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |