|
24.05.2024 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
24.05.2024 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2024 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2024 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2024 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2024 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2023 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
207 |
|
18.12.2023 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
11.05.2023 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.05.2023 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2023 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2023 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
03.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.01.2020 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2020 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
11.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
12 |
|
09.10.2014 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
09.10.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Fax filed during the PCT2 procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
111 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
89 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.01.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
24.01.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
95 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
72 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |