Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017094277 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201615373290 | 08.12.2016 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102006531B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2019 | B1 | KR20160148038 | 23.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | WO2013US49126 | 02.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101822247B | Global Dossier | 25.01.2018 | B1 | KR20150036249 | 07.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101799165B | Global Dossier | 17.11.2017 | B1 | KR20150024934 | 09.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | WO2013US49126 | 02.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6775952B | Global Dossier | 28.10.2020 | B2 | JP2015526973 | 10.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | WO2013US49126 | 02.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6416086B | Global Dossier | 31.10.2018 | B2 | JP2015526972 | 10.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL236071 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3200465 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2023 | C0 | EP3200465 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2023 | B1 | EP3200465 | 02.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | EP13737509 | 02.07.2013 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | WO2013US49126 | 02.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2868085 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107105295B | Global Dossier | 20.10.2020 | B | CN107105295 | 29.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | CN201380034837 | 02.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104509115 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104396253B | Global Dossier | 26.10.2018 | B | CN104396253 | 04.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | WO2013US49126 | 02.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2877658 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2018 | C | CA2877658 | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013286730B | Global Dossier | 20.07.2017 | B2 | AU2013286730 | 22.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2868086 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | WO2013US49126 | 02.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014033008 | 18.04.2023 | B1 | BR112014033008 | 27.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014033011 | 27.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | WO2013US49126 | 02.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122017006773 | 04.04.2023 | B1 | BR122017006773 | 03.09.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | BR112014033011 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | WO2013US49126 | 02.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1204415 | 13.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12014502783 | 02.02.2015 | B1 | PH12014502783 | 02.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2654138 | 16.05.2018 | C2 | RU2015103126 | 20.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201408118Y | 29.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA115335 | 25.10.2017 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | WO2013US49121 | 02.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014008290 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014008287 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201313932929 | 01.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014008286 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9635369 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2017 | B2 | US2014003493 | 02.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9716892 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2017 | B2 | US2014003492 | 02.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201313932929 | 01.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9602827 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2017 | B2 | US2014003491 | 02.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6400660B | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B2 | JP2017079480 | 27.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY168860 | 04.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI575936B | 21.03.2017 | B | TW201412128 | 16.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI595772B | 11.08.2017 | B | TW201414315 | 01.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932960 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI552574B | 01.10.2016 | B | TW201415895 | 16.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201313932929 | 01.07.2013 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201714452 | 16.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261669587 | 09.07.2012 | US201261667387 | 02.07.2012 | US201313932909 | 01.07.2013 | US201361798135 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3200465 | Application deemed to be withdrawn : 03.01.2024 |