EP2893642 - SYMMETRIC PUNCTURING FOR CQI/PCI REPORTING ON THE HS-DPCCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/32] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAMMI, Sairamesh Ringstedsgatan 39 S-164 48 Stockholm / SE | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 13737692.7 | 18.06.2013 | [2017/32] | WO2013SE50717 | Priority number, date | US201261698868P | 10.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261698868 P | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014038993 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2893642 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2893642 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/23, H04L1/00 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
H03M13/23 (EP);
H03M13/6362 (EP);
H03M13/6525 (EP);
H04L1/0026 (EP);
H04L1/0029 (EP);
H04L1/0068 (EP);
H04L1/0059 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYMMETRISCHE PUNKTIERUNG FÜR CQI/PCI NACHRICHTEN AUF DEM HS-DPCCH KANAL | [2017/09] | English: | SYMMETRIC PUNCTURING FOR CQI/PCI REPORTING ON THE HS-DPCCH | [2015/29] | French: | POINCONNAGE SYMÉTRIQUE POUR LES RAPPORTS CQI/PCI TRANSMIS PAR LE CANAL HS-DPCCH | [2017/09] |
Former [2015/29] | SYMMETRISCHE PUNKTIERUNG FÜR CQI/PCI-BERICHTERSTATTUNG ÜBER HS-DPCCH | ||
Former [2015/29] | POINÇONNAGE SYMÉTRIQUE POUR RAPPORT CQI/PCI SUR LE HS-DPCCH | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 05.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XPI] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.212, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20121220), vol. RAN WG1, no. V11.4.0, pages 1 - 161, XP050691183 [XP] 1-7 * page 19 - page 20 * * page 117 * [I] 8-21 | [XAYI] - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE LTD, "Remaining issues on HS-SCCH design for Four Branch Downlink MIMO", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao; 20120813 - 20120817, (20120805), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-123565 REMAINING ISSUES ON 4BRANCH DL MIMO HS-SCCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_70/Docs/, (20120805), XP050661443 [X] 1 * page 1 - page 3 * [A] 2,3,9,10,16,17 [Y] 1,4-8,11-15,18-21 [I] 8,15 | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Further discussion on HS-SCCH design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20120813 - 20120817, (20120805), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-123816 FURTHER DISCUSSION ON HS-SCCH DESIGN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_70/Docs/, (20120805), XP050661669 [X] 1 * page 1 - page 4 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 8,15 | [YA] - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE LTD, "Remaining issues on feedback design for Four Branch Downlink MIMO", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao; 20120813 - 20120817, (20120805), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-123566 4BRANCH_DL_MIMO_FEEDBACK_REMAINING_ISSUES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_70/Docs/, (20120805), XP050661444 [Y] 1,4-8,11-15,18-21 * pages 2-5 * [A] 2,3,9,10,16,17 | [A] - SIEMENS, "New puncturing scheme for convolutional codes", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-99G51_TAIL_PUNCTURING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (19991021), vol. RAN WG1, no. New York, USA; 19991021, XP050090449 [A] 1-21 * page 1 - page 2 * |