EP2877811 - INTERFEROMETRIC DISTANCE MEASURING ASSEMBLY AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/23] | INTERFEROMETRIC DISTANCE MEASURING ARRANGEMENT AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | ||
[2019/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexagon Technology Center GmbH Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Thomas Mühletobelstr. 31 CH-9400 Rorschach / CH | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2019/40] |
Former [2015/23] | Gyaja, Christoph Benjamin Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | Application number, filing date | 13739218.9 | 18.07.2013 | [2019/40] | WO2013EP65224 | Priority number, date | EP20120177615 | 24.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12177615 | [2015/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014016201 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2877811 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2877811 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
G01B9/02004 (EP,US);
G01B9/02091 (US);
G01B11/14 (US);
G01B9/02027 (EP,US);
G01B9/02044 (US);
G01B9/0205 (EP,US);
G01B9/02057 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERFEROMETRISCHE ENTFERNUNGSMESSANORDNUNG UND EBENSOLCHES VERFAHREN | [2015/23] | English: | INTERFEROMETRIC DISTANCE MEASURING ASSEMBLY AND METHOD | [2019/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE DISTANCE INTERFÉROMÉTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2019/23] |
Former [2015/23] | INTERFEROMETRIC DISTANCE MEASURING ARRANGEMENT AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | ||
Former [2015/23] | DISPOSITIF DE TÉLÉMÉTRIE PAR INTERFÉROMÉTRIE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 03.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2013 | AL | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | DK | 02.10.2019 | EE | 02.10.2019 | ES | 02.10.2019 | FI | 02.10.2019 | HR | 02.10.2019 | IT | 02.10.2019 | LT | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | MK | 02.10.2019 | MT | 02.10.2019 | PL | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | RS | 02.10.2019 | SE | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | SM | 02.10.2019 | TR | 02.10.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | NO | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
TR | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
TR | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 02.10.2019 | |
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 02.10.2019 | |
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 02.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2007002327 (ZHOU YAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0053]; figures 8-10 *; | [ID]WO2009036861 (LEICA GEOSYSTEMS AG [CH], et al) [ID] 1-15 * Seite 17, Zeile 26 - Seite 19, Zeile 10, Abbildungen 5a-5h *; | [XI] - YOUXIN MAO ET AL, "Simultaneous multi-wavelength-band optical frequency domain imaging for spectroscopic investigations", SPIE, PO BOX 10 BELLINGHAM WA 98227-0010, USA, (20110822), vol. 8155, ISBN 9780819487650, pages 81551A-1 - 81551A-7, XP040563664 [X] 1,11 * pages 81551A-2 - pages 81551A-3; figure 2 * [I] 2-10,12-15 | [XI] - WANG ET AL, "Wavelength encoded OCT imaging using swept-source", SPIE, PO BOX 10 BELLINGHAM WA 98227-0010 USA, (20071112), vol. 6826, XP040431908 [X] 1,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-10,12-15 | Examination | - BEAU A STANDISH ET AL, "In vivo endoscopic multi-beam optical coherence tomography", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL GB, (20100207), vol. 55, no. 3, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 615 - 622, XP020171750 | by applicant | DE4325337 | DE4325347 | US5402582 | EP1474650 | EP1739811 | WO2009036861 | - T. KLEIN ET AL., "Megahertz OCT for ultrawide-field retinal imaging with a 1050nm Fourier domain mode-locked laser", OPT. EXPRESS, (2011), vol. 19, pages 3044 - 3062 | - Y.K. TAO ET AL., "High-speed complex conjugate resolved retinal spectral domain optical coherence tomography using sinusoidal phase modulation", OPT. LETT., (2007), vol. 32, doi:doi:10.1364/OL.32.002918, page 2918, XP001508526 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.32.002918 | - T. DRESEL ET AL., "Three-dimensional sensing of rough surfaces by coherence radar", APPL. OPT., (1992), vol. 31, doi:doi:10.1364/AO.31.000919, page 919, XP000248792 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.31.000919 | - S.W. LEE ET AL., "Line-field optical coherence tomography using frequency-sweeping source", IEEE J. SELEC. TOP. QUANT. ELECTR., (2008), vol. 14, page 50, XP011204178 | EP20110171582 | EP20120177582 |