EP2874664 - COMPOSITION FOR THERAPEUTIC USE, INCLUDING AN ORGANIC LIPID PHASE AND A RARE-EARTH RADIOISOTOPE COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/22] | COMPOSITION FOR THERAPEUTIC USE, INCLUDING AN ORGANIC LIPID PHASE AND A RARE- EARTH RADIOISOTOPE COMPLEX | ||
[2019/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre Eugene Marquis Rue de Flandre 35000 Rennes / FR | For all designated states Ecole Nationale Supérieure de Chimie Beaulieu 263 avenue Général Leclerc 35700 Rennes / FR | For all designated states Université de Rennes I 2 Rue du Thabor 35000 Rennes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states Centre Eugene Marquis Rue de Flandre 35000 Rennes / FR | ||
For all designated states Ecole Nationale Superieure de Chimie Beaulieu 263 avenue Général Leclerc 35700 Rennes / FR | |||
For all designated states Université de Rennes I 2 Rue du Thabor 35000 Rennes Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEPAREUR, Nicolas 25 rue de la Touche 35770 Vern-sur-Seiche / FR | 02 /
GARIN, Etienne Le Fumeson 35520 La Meziere / FR | 03 /
NOIRET, Nicolas 23 rue Raoul de la Futaye 35250 Saint-Sulpice-la-Foret / FR | 04 /
ARDISSON, Valérie 1 allée Louis Jobbe Duval 35000 Rennes / FR | [2019/25] |
Former [2015/22] | 01 /
LEPAREUR, Nicolas 25 rue de la Touche F-35770 Vern-sur-Seiche / FR | ||
02 /
GARIN, Etienne Le Fumeson F-35520 La Meziere / FR | |||
03 /
NOIRET, Nicolas 23 rue Raoul de la Futaye F-35250 Saint-Sulpice-la-Foret / FR | |||
04 /
ARDISSON, Valérie 1 allée Louis Jobbe Duval F-35000 Rennes / FR | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [2019/25] |
Former [2015/22] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13739670.1 | 17.07.2013 | [2019/25] | WO2013EP65131 | Priority number, date | FR20120056951 | 18.07.2012 Original published format: FR 1256951 | [2015/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014012997 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2874664 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2874664 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/04, A61K51/12, A61P35/00, A61K103/30, A61K103/32 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
A61K51/0404 (EP,US);
A61K51/0497 (US);
A61K51/0478 (EP,US);
A61K51/1217 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR THERAPEUTISCHEN VERWENDUNG, MIT EINER ORGANISCHEN LIPIDPHASE UND EINEM KOMPLEX VON EINEM RADIOISOTOP DER SELTENEN ERDEN | [2019/11] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR THERAPEUTIC USE, INCLUDING AN ORGANIC LIPID PHASE AND A RARE-EARTH RADIOISOTOPE COMPLEX | [2019/11] | French: | COMPOSITION À USAGE THÉRAPEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UNE PHASE ORGANIQUE LIPIDIQUE ET UN COMPLEXE DE TERRE RARE RADIOISOTOPIQUE | [2015/22] |
Former [2015/22] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR THERAPEUTISCHEN VERWENDUNG, MIT EINER ORGANISCHEN LIPIDPHASE UND EINEM SELTENERDRADIOISOTOPKOMPLEX | ||
Former [2015/22] | COMPOSITION FOR THERAPEUTIC USE, INCLUDING AN ORGANIC LIPID PHASE AND A RARE- EARTH RADIOISOTOPE COMPLEX | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 22.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2013 | AL | 19.06.2019 | AT | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | DK | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | FI | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | PL | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | RS | 19.06.2019 | SE | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | TR | 19.06.2019 | LU | 17.07.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | NO | 19.09.2019 | GR | 20.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 17.07.2013 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 17.07.2013 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011101436 (ENSCR [FR], et al) [A] 6,7 * examples 5-7 ** figure 1 *; | [X] - URIZZI P ET AL, "Attachment of radiometals to LDL with lipid analogues of EDTA or DTPA type complexing agents. Comparison of two labeling procedures", JOURNAL DE CHIMIE PHYSIQUE, SOCIETE DE CHIMIE PHYSIQUE, PARIS, FR, (19970101), vol. 94, no. 2, ISSN 0021-7689, pages 371 - 375, XP008089471 [X] 1 * page 373, sections "precipitation reactions" et "results and discussion" * | [YD] - YU J ET AL, "Y-oxine-ethiodol, a potential radiopharmaceutical for the treatment of liver cancer", APPLIED RADIATION AND ISOTOPES, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 58, no. 5, ISSN 0969-8043, (20030501), pages 567 - 573, (20030501), XP027388557 [YD] 1-9 * abstract * * page 570, column left, paragraph last * * page 571, column left, paragraph 2 * * page 571, column right, paragraph lqst - page 572, column right, paragraph 2 * | [YD] - SUBRAMANIAN SURESH ET AL, "Preparation of Lu-177-Labeled Oxine in Lipiodol as a Possible Agent for Therapy of Hepatocellular Carcinoma: A Preliminary Animal Study", CANCER BIOTHERAPY & RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (201010), vol. 25, no. 5, ISSN 1084-9785, pages 539 - 543, XP002693466 [YD] 1-9 * page 542, column right, paragraph 2 - page 543, column left, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/CBR.2010.0792 | [YD] - DAS TAPAS ET AL, "Preparation of 166Ho-oxine-lipiodol and its preliminary bioevaluation for the potential application in therapy of liver cancer.", NUCLEAR MEDICINE COMMUNICATIONS MAY 2009, (200905), vol. 30, no. 5, ISSN 0143-3636, pages 362 - 367, XP008160641 [YD] 1-9 * page 366 - page 367, column left, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/MNM.0b013e328329981a | [Y] - JIANLIN Y ET AL, "Raman spectroscopic studies on tropolone complexes with La, Nd, Sm, Yb", SPECTROCHIMICA ACTA. PART A: MOLECULAR AND BIOMOLECULAR SPECTROSCOPY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 64, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.SAA.2005.09.017, ISSN 1386-1425, (20060701), pages 1072 - 1076, (20060701), XP028036481 [Y] 1-9 * page 1072, column left, lines 1-6 * * page 1074, column left, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.saa.2005.09.017 | by applicant | - E. GARIN; P. BOURGUET, Nuclear Medicine in Clinical Diagnosis and Treatment, (2004), pages 473 - 483 | - B. LAMBERT, J.NUCL.MED., (2005), vol. 46, pages 60 - 66 | - S.J. WANG ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1996), vol. 37, pages 332 - 335 | - J. YU ET AL., APPL. RADIAT. ISOT., (2003), vol. 58, pages 567 - 573 | - P.Y. MU ET AL., J. RADIOANAL. NUCL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 272, pages 669 - 671 | - S. SUBRAMANIAN ET AL., CANCER BIOTH. RADIOPHARM., (2010), vol. 25, pages 539 - 543 | - T. DAS ET AL., NUCL. MED. COMMUN., (2009), vol. 30, pages 362 - 367 | - S.J. OH ET AL., APPL. RADIAT. ISOT., (2001), vol. 54, pages 419 - 427 | - S.J. OH ET AL., APPL. RADIAT. ISOT., (2003), vol. 59, pages 225 - 230 |