EP2854726 - NEGATIVE PRESSURE ON NECK TO TREAT OBSTRUCTIVE SLEEP APNEA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCAREBERRY, Eugene, Nelson c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Steffen, Thomas Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13740061.0 | 04.06.2013 | WO2013IB54582 | Priority number, date | US201261655542P | 05.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261655542 P | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013182978 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2854726 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/56 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
A61F5/56 (EP,US);
A61H9/00 (US);
A61H2201/1657 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | ANWENDUNG VON UNTERDRUCK AUF DEN HALS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OBSTRUKTIVER SCHLAFAPNOE | [2015/15] | English: | NEGATIVE PRESSURE ON NECK TO TREAT OBSTRUCTIVE SLEEP APNEA | [2015/15] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'APNÉE OBSTRUCTIVE DU SOMMEIL PAR PRESSION NÉGATIVE SUR LE COU | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006266369 (ATKINSON ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0032]; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2009177124 (SILWA JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009250071 (KIMANI MWANGI ANTHONY P [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2011066086 (AARESTAD JEROME [US], et al) [X] 1-15* paragraphs [0013] - [0023] - [0 31] , [0 61] - [0063] - [0 87] - [0093] - [0 97] - [0105]; figure - * |