17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
02.03.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
24.03.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
21.02.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.02.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.02.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.02.2017 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
17.02.2017 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
06.10.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.09.2016 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
13.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.11.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
17.04.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
11.04.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
07.02.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
07.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|