08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
14.02.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
13.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
27.09.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
08.03.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
01.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.02.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
05.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
24.04.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.12.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.08.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.08.2016 |
First examination report |
|
25.04.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.04.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
20.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.09.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
18.09.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
18.09.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
08.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.03.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
29.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
31.10.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
09.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|