EP2806843 - PATIENT POSITIONING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BCG Medical, LLC 6715 Rancho Toyon Place San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2017/09] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states BCG Medical LLC 6715 Rancho Toyon Place San Diego, California 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIAP, Brandon Cuongquoc 6715 Rancho Toyon Place San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Turner, Craig Robert A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13740933.0 | 18.01.2013 | [2017/09] | WO2013US22021 | Priority number, date | US201213359734 | 27.01.2012 Original published format: US201213359734 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013112359 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2806843 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2806843 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/00, A61G7/10, A61G1/01, A61G7/075, A61G1/013, A61G1/044 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
A61G1/013 (EP);
A61G1/01 (EP);
A61G1/044 (EP);
A61G7/0755 (EP);
A61G7/1023 (EP);
A61G7/1026 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | A61G7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATIENTENPOSITIONIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/49] | English: | PATIENT POSITIONING DEVICE | [2014/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT DE PATIENT | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 29.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2013 | AL | 01.03.2017 | AT | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | IT | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | PL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | RS | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | TR | 01.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.01.2013 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
TR | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 18.01.2013 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
TR | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
TR | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011296609 (GIAP BRANDON CUONGQUOC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * figure - * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0052] *; | [XYI]US5014724 (MILLER LARRY C [US]) [X] 7 * figure - * * column 4, line 47 - line 56 * * column 3 - column 7 * [Y] 1-6 [I] 8-11; | [XI]US5891187 (WINTHROP NEIL [US], et al) [X] 7 * figure - * * column 6 - column 9 * [I] 1-6,8-11; | [A]US3861666 (NISHIYAMA SHOJI, et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011098794 (ANDERSON THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2011296609 (GIAP BRANDON CUONGQUOC [US]); | [Y]US5891187 (WINTHROP NEIL [US], et al); | [Y]US2002166168 (WEEDLING ROBERT E [US], et al); | [A]US2002107558 (CLIFTON GUY L [US], et al) | by applicant | US2011296609 |