EP2769292 - TRENDING OF AGGREGATED PERSONALIZED INFORMATION STREAMS AND MULTI-DIMENSIONAL GRAPHICAL DEPICTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bottlenose, Inc. 4111 Colbath Avenue Sherman Oaks, CA 91423 / US | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIVACK, Nova 4111 Colbath Avenue Sherman Oaks, CA 91423 / US | 02 /
TER HEIDE, Dominiek Westerdok 394 NL-1013 BH Amsterdam / NL | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Leach, James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Leach, James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13741546.9 | 28.01.2013 | WO2013US23504 | Priority number, date | US201261591696P | 27.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261591696 P | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013113028 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769292 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06Q50/00, G06Q30/02 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
G06Q50/01 (EP);
G06F16/00 (EP);
G06Q30/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/35] | G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | TRENDVERFOLGUNG VON AGGREGIERTEN PERSONALISIERTEN INFORMATIONSSTRÖMEN UND GRAFISCHE MEHRDIMENSIONALE DARSTELLUNG DAVON | [2014/35] | English: | TRENDING OF AGGREGATED PERSONALIZED INFORMATION STREAMS AND MULTI-DIMENSIONAL GRAPHICAL DEPICTION THEREOF | [2014/35] | French: | ORIENTATION PRÉFÉRENTIELLE DE FLUX D'INFORMATIONS PERSONNALISÉS REGROUPÉS ET ILLUSTRATION GRAPHIQUE PLURIDIMENSIONNELLE ASSOCIÉE | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 21.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 03.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010100537 (DRUZGALSKI ADRIAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2010114946 (KUMAR MANI [IN], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2010030648 (MANOLESCU DRAGOS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2006173957 (ROBINSON ERIC M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2006282328 (GERACE THOMAS A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2010042944 (ROBINSON ERIC M [US], et al); | [Y]US2012005224 (AHRENS SPENCER GREG [US], et al); | [Y]US2005114786 (DECOMBE JEAN MICHEL [US]); | [Y]WO2009007754 (INTEGRA SP LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]US2010049852 (WHITNAH THOMAS SCOTT [US], et al); | [Y]US2011067030 (ISARD MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2009327275 (WALKER HUBERT M [US], et al); | [A]US2006173957 (ROBINSON ERIC M [US], et al); | [A]WO2009035618 (RADAR NETWORKS INC [US], et al) |