EP2890619 - IMPROVED TUBE HEAD COMPRISING A BARRIER-FORMING INSERT, ALLOWING CENTERING OF THE INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albéa Services ZAC des Barbanniers 1 avenue du Général de Gaulle "Le Signac" 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURICE, Thierry 10 rue René Lemoine F-51000 Chalons En Champagne / FR | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/28] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2015/28] | Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13741784.6 | 29.07.2013 | [2016/28] | WO2013EP65889 | Priority number, date | FR20120058053 | 28.08.2012 Original published format: FR 1258053 | [2015/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014032880 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2890619 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2890619 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/12, B29C45/14 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
B65D35/12 (EP,US);
B65D51/005 (US);
B29C45/14073 (US);
B29C45/14336 (US);
B29C45/2618 (US);
B65D39/0076 (US);
B29C45/14065 (EP,US);
B29C45/14598 (EP,US);
B29L2023/20 (EP,US);
B65D2539/008 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER ROHRKOPF MIT BARRIEREFORMENDEM EINSATZ MIT ZENTRIERUNG DES EINSATZES | [2015/28] | English: | IMPROVED TUBE HEAD COMPRISING A BARRIER-FORMING INSERT, ALLOWING CENTERING OF THE INSERT | [2015/28] | French: | TÊTE DE TUBE AMELIORÉE COMPRENANT UN INSERT FORMANT BARRIÈRE ET PERMETTANT UN CENTRAGE DUDIT INSERT | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 26.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2013 | AL | 13.07.2016 | AT | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | IT | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | MT | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | RS | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | IE | 29.07.2016 | LU | 29.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 29.07.2013 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
MT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 29.07.2013 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
MT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.07.2013 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3295725 (ROGER BRANDT) [X] 1,2,6-9,12 * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 29; figures 5-6 *; | [A]GB2098917 (MAEGERLE KARL) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 3 - line 96; figures 1-3 * |