EP2810782 - PRINTED IMAGE INSPECTION APPARATUS AND PRINTED IMAGE INSPECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/50] | PRINTED IMAGE INSPECTION DEVICE AND PRINTED IMAGE INSPECTION METHOD | ||
[2019/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCREEN Holdings Co., Ltd. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states SCREEN Holdings Co., Ltd. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | ||
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Tomotaka c/o SCREEN HOLDINGS CO., LTD. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | 02 /
IMAMURA, Atsushi c/o SCREEN HOLDINGS CO., LTD. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | 03 /
KOIKE, Shiro c/o SCREEN HOLDINGS CO., LTD. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Toshihiro c/o SCREEN HOLDINGS CO., LTD. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | [2015/18] |
Former [2014/50] | 01 /
KATO, Tomotaka c/o DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG. CO. LTD. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
IMAMURA, Atsushi c/o DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG. CO. LTD. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
KOIKE, Shiro c/o DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG. CO. LTD. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
SATO, Toshihiro c/o DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG. CO. LTD. Tenjinkita-machi 1-1 Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13742985.8 | 25.01.2013 | [2019/11] | WO2013JP00382 | Priority number, date | JP20120022068 | 03.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012022068 | [2014/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013114838 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2810782 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2810782 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/46, B41J2/01, B41J3/60, H04N1/00 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
B41J3/60 (EP,US);
G06K15/02 (US);
H04N1/4095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG GEDRUCKTER BILDER UND DRUCKBILDÜBERPRÜFUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/50] | English: | PRINTED IMAGE INSPECTION APPARATUS AND PRINTED IMAGE INSPECTION METHOD | [2019/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION D'IMAGE IMPRIMÉE ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION D'IMAGE IMPRIMÉE | [2014/50] |
Former [2014/50] | PRINTED IMAGE INSPECTION DEVICE AND PRINTED IMAGE INSPECTION METHOD | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2014 | Translation filed | 25.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 28.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2013 | AL | 13.03.2019 | AT | 13.03.2019 | CY | 13.03.2019 | CZ | 13.03.2019 | DK | 13.03.2019 | EE | 13.03.2019 | ES | 13.03.2019 | FI | 13.03.2019 | HR | 13.03.2019 | IT | 13.03.2019 | LT | 13.03.2019 | LV | 13.03.2019 | MC | 13.03.2019 | MK | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | NL | 13.03.2019 | PL | 13.03.2019 | RO | 13.03.2019 | RS | 13.03.2019 | SE | 13.03.2019 | SI | 13.03.2019 | SK | 13.03.2019 | SM | 13.03.2019 | TR | 13.03.2019 | BG | 13.06.2019 | NO | 13.06.2019 | GR | 14.06.2019 | IS | 13.07.2019 | PT | 13.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.01.2013 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1154634 (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 3,6 * abstract ** paragraph [0052] *; | [XY]US2003218781 (SUINO TOORU [JP]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0107] , [0110] - [0112] * [Y] 2,3,5,6; | [Y]US2009161124 (TAMURA HIROKAZU [JP]) [Y] 2,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0025] , [0045] , [0054] *; | [XY]US2011116110 (ROOF BRYAN J [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0034] , [0043] , [0044] * [Y] 2,3,5,6 | International search | [A]JP2009000930 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2009025374 (KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECH); | [A]JP4265421B (FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.) | by applicant | JPH04265421 |