Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9821736 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2017 | B2 | US2015183387 | 02.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013FR51529 | 28.06.2013 | FR1256337 | 02.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015522751 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013FR51529 | 28.06.2013 | FR1256337 | 02.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104471213B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2016 | B | CN104471213 | 25.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013FR51529 | 28.06.2013 | FR1256337 | 02.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2877899 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2020 | C | CA2877899 | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013FR51529 | 28.06.2013 | FR1256337 | 02.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2867498 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | B1 | EP2867498 | 06.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013FR51529 | 28.06.2013 | FR1256337 | 02.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014033072 | 31.05.2022 | B1 | BR112014033072 | 27.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013FR51529 | 28.06.2013 | FR1256337 | 02.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2629303 | 28.08.2017 | C2 | RU2015103073 | 20.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013FR51529 | 28.06.2013 | FR1256337 | 02.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014006309 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1256337 | 02.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2992796 | 01.05.2015 | B1 | FR2992796 | 03.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1256337 | 02.07.2012 |