Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014184602 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB01249 | 15.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9515771 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2016 | B2 | US2014341192 | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB01249 | 15.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2997689 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2017 | B1 | EP2997689 | 23.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB01249 | 15.05.2013 |