Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104641157B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2017 | B | CN104641157 | 20.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102012215125 | 24.08.2012 | WO2013DE200035 | 10.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2888511 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2020 | B1 | EP2888511 | 01.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012215125 | 24.08.2012 | WO2013DE200035 | 10.07.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014029392 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012215125 | 24.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102012215125 | 27.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012215125 | 24.08.2012 |