EP2813736 - SEALING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/51] | SEALING STRUCTURE AND ROTATING MACHINE EQUIPPED WITH SAME | ||
[2016/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama 220-8401 / JP | [2015/16] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONISHI Tomoyuki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMOTO Shin c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/51] | Application number, filing date | 13746796.5 | 05.02.2013 | [2016/48] | WO2013JP52564 | Priority number, date | JP20120023071 | 06.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012023071 | [2014/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013118701 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2813736 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2813736 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/453, F01D11/02, F02C7/28 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
F01D11/02 (EP,US);
F01D11/122 (US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,US);
F05D2250/61 (EP,US);
F05D2300/611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2016/24] | English: | SEALING STRUCTURE | [2016/24] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2016/24] |
Former [2014/51] | DICHTUNGSSTRUKTUR UND DREHMASCHINE DAMIT | ||
Former [2014/51] | SEALING STRUCTURE AND ROTATING MACHINE EQUIPPED WITH SAME | ||
Former [2014/51] | STRUCTURE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET MACHINE TOURNANTE ÉQUIPÉE DE CETTE STRUCTURE | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2014 | Translation filed | 20.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 19.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2013 | AL | 30.11.2016 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | HR | 30.11.2016 | IT | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | MK | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | RS | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | SM | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | IE | 05.02.2017 | LU | 05.02.2017 | MT | 05.02.2017 | BG | 28.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | FR | 28.02.2017 | GB | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | IS | 30.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.02.2013 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
MT | 05.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
GB | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.02.2013 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
MT | 05.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
GB | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 05.02.2013 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
MT | 05.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
GB | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.02.2013 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
MT | 05.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
GB | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
MT | 05.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
GB | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
GB | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001004436 (CHASRIPOOR FARSHAD [US], et al) [Y] 7,8* paragraphs [0002] , [0017] - [0020] - [0028] , [0029]; figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]US2010164179 (HIRAKAWA YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraphs [0050] , [0070] - [0073] - [0081] - [0088] - [0114] , [0126] , [0127]; figures 1,7 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 6 | International search | [Y]JPH1018016 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO); | [Y]JP2005214148 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND, et al); | [Y]JP2006132328 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [A]FR2895021 (SNECMA SA [FR]); | [Y]JP2011185272 (SULZER METCO AG) | by applicant | JP2009174655 |